|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/05/1948 | 31/05/1948 | 21 days | Special | Renumbered to BR 61266 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1948 | 29/09/1948 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1950 | 31/03/1950 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 9934 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1952 | 25/01/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28172 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1953 | 23/10/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28281 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1955 | 01/07/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28219 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1957 | 22/10/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28550 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1959 | 15/01/1960 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28546 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1960 | 17/12/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1253 (10/11), 1254 (12/11), 1255 (14/11), 1256 (17/11), 1257 (19/11), 1258 (21/11), 1259 (24/11), 1260 (26/11), 1261 (28/11), 1262 (1/12), 1263 (3/12), 1264 (5/12), 1265 (9/12), 1266 (10/12), 1267 (12/12), 1268 (16/12), 1269 (24/12), 1270 (25/12), 1271 (26/12), 1272 (29/12) and 1273 (30/12). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1251 (26152/47), 1252 (26153/47), 1253 (26154/47), 1254 (26155/47), 1256 (26157/47), 1257 (26158/47), 1259 (26160/47), 1260 (26161/47), 1261 (26162/47), 1263 (26164/47), 1264 (26165/47), 1266 (26167/47), 1267 (26168/47), 1270 (26171/47), 1271 (26172/47) and 1272 (26173/47). | SLS/194802 |
04/07/1948 | Locomotives Trials | Trialed on the ex L.N.E.R. Southern Area up to 4/7, have been: 'A.4' Nos. 22, 60033/34 and 'B.1' Nos. 61251/66. | SLS/194808 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop Yard) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/12/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1266 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26167 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
11/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Special) - Arr: 11/05/1948. Dep: 31/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61266 |
||
14/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/09/1948. Dep: 29/09/1948. | ||
29/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1950. Dep: 31/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9934 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1952. Dep: 25/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28172 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
24/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1953. Dep: 23/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28281 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1955. Dep: 01/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28219 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1957. Dep: 22/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28550 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1959. Dep: 15/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28546 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
15/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960. | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61266 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Albert Looms: Spondon |