|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 24/06/1949 | 02/09/1949 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 9939 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61270 |
||
Stratford Works | 31/12/1950 | 17/02/1951 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 28531 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 28/05/1951 | 07/06/1951 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 11/08/1952 | 27/09/1952 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28835 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/11/1953 | 09/01/1954 | 61 days | Heavy Intermediate | Collision at Goodmayes |
||
Stratford Works | 14/04/1955 | 11/06/1955 | 59 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 13/05/1956 | 29/06/1956 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28542 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 07/11/1957 | 13/12/1957 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 29/04/1958 | 30/05/1958 | 32 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 30/09/1958 | 14/11/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28276 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1960 | 24/03/1960 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1961 | 01/02/1961 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28753 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1253 (10/11), 1254 (12/11), 1255 (14/11), 1256 (17/11), 1257 (19/11), 1258 (21/11), 1259 (24/11), 1260 (26/11), 1261 (28/11), 1262 (1/12), 1263 (3/12), 1264 (5/12), 1265 (9/12), 1266 (10/12), 1267 (12/12), 1268 (16/12), 1269 (24/12), 1270 (25/12), 1271 (26/12), 1272 (29/12) and 1273 (30/12). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1251 (26152/47), 1252 (26153/47), 1253 (26154/47), 1254 (26155/47), 1256 (26157/47), 1257 (26158/47), 1259 (26160/47), 1260 (26161/47), 1261 (26162/47), 1263 (26164/47), 1264 (26165/47), 1266 (26167/47), 1267 (26168/47), 1270 (26171/47), 1271 (26172/47) and 1272 (26173/47). | SLS/194802 |
18/03/1959 | FA Cup excursions | The Norwich-Luton cup replay of 18th March brought the following to Birmingham New Street-Bls 61046/8 of 32A, 61204 of 31F and 61270/317 of 32A; Class 5s 44810/6 an 45238, all 14A. | SLS/195904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/12/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1270 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26171 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
24/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1949. Dep: 02/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9939 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61270 |
||
31/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1950. Dep: 17/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28531 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1951. Dep: 07/06/1951. | ||
11/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1952. Dep: 27/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28835 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/11/1953. Dep: 09/01/1954. Work undertaken: Collision at Goodmayes |
||
14/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/04/1955. Dep: 11/06/1955. | ||
07/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
23/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
13/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1956. Dep: 29/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28542 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1957. Dep: 13/12/1957. | ||
29/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1958. Dep: 30/05/1958. | ||
30/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1958. Dep: 14/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28276 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
18/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
04/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/03/1960. Dep: 24/03/1960. | ||
02/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1961. Dep: 01/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28753 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61270 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |