Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1271   26/12/1947
BR 61271   07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26172
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Mon 26/12/1947 to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)
Withdrawal Mon 30/07/1962 off Woodford Halse (2F)
Scrapping Mon 20/08/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 14 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes 20/8/62 In for cutting up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) 26/12/1947
38A Colwick 20/09/1953
38E Woodford Halse 16/06/1957
   Withdrawn 30/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NOR Norwich Thorpe 26/12/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   w/e 04/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/12/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9908)
07/05/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9870)
29/09/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28503)
05/04/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28583)
26/06/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28864)
22/09/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28208)
23/09/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28398)
31/03/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28419)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 07/03/1949 07/05/1949 62 days General
Boiler number 9870 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61271
 
Stratford Works 20/08/1950 29/09/1950 41 days General
Boiler number 28503 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 21/02/1951 10/03/1951 18 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 02/02/1952 05/04/1952 64 days General
Boiler number 28583 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 21/10/1952 20/11/1952 31 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 15/05/1954 26/06/1954 43 days General
Boiler number 28864 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 22/08/1956 22/09/1956 32 days General
Boiler number 28208 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 18/08/1958 23/09/1958 37 days General
Boiler number 28398 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 26/02/1960 31/03/1960 35 days General
Boiler number 28419 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/12/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1271
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26172
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
07/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1949. Dep: 07/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9870 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61271
   
20/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1950. Dep: 29/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28503 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/02/1951. Dep: 10/03/1951.    
02/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1952. Dep: 05/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28583 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1952. Dep: 20/11/1952.    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
15/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28864 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28208 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
18/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1958. Dep: 23/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28398 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1960. Dep: 31/03/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28419 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61271 from Woodford Halse (2F)    
20/08/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev