|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 05/09/1949 | 01/10/1949 | 27 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61278 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/05/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/06/1953 | 11/07/1953 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 28664 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1955 | 20/08/1955 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/10/1957 | 16/11/1957 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/03/1959 | 27/03/1959 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28655 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/10/1959 | 13/10/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/10/1959 | 12/11/1959 | 21 days | L/C | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/10/1961 | 01/12/1961 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/11/1962 | 08/12/1962 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Inverurie Works | 31/10/1963 | 21/11/1963 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 05/12/1963 | 10/12/1963 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/09/1964 | 31/10/1964 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/06/1966 | 13/08/1966 | 52 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1274 (9/1), 1275 (12/1), 1276 (14/1), 1277 (16/1), 1278 (19/1), 1279 (21/1), 1280 (23/1), 1281 (27/1), 1282 (28/1), 1283 (2/2), and 1284 (6/2). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1262 (26163 of 1947), 1274/5 (26175/6 of 1947), 1277/8 (26178/9 of 1947), 1280-4 (26181-5 of 1947). No. 1221 was observed at Cowlairs West Junction, bearing the name Sir Alexander Erskine Hill and still painted green and lettered L.N.E.R. This engine is now fitted with electric lighting | SLS/194803 |
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/01/1948 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1278 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26179 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
05/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/09/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61278 |
||
31/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 31/05/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951. | ||
26/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28664 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/07/1955. Dep: 20/08/1955. | ||
16/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/10/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957. | ||
02/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 27/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28655 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1959. Dep: 13/10/1959. | ||
23/10/1959 | Works Visit | |||
25/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/10/1961. Dep: 01/12/1961. | ||
21/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1962. Dep: 08/12/1962. | ||
31/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1963. Dep: 21/11/1963. | ||
05/12/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/12/1963. Dep: 10/12/1963. | ||
24/09/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/09/1964. Dep: 31/10/1964. | ||
23/06/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/06/1966. Dep: 13/08/1966. | ||
22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61278 from Dundee West (62B) | ||
01/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |