|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/09/1949 | 29/10/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9862 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61279 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1949 | 05/11/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1952 | 15/03/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28413 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1954 | 22/05/1954 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 28342 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1954 | 31/05/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1956 | 07/07/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28234 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/10/1958 | 21/10/1958 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 28857 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1960 | 22/12/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28597 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1274 (9/1), 1275 (12/1), 1276 (14/1), 1277 (16/1), 1278 (19/1), 1279 (21/1), 1280 (23/1), 1281 (27/1), 1282 (28/1), 1283 (2/2), and 1284 (6/2). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1262 (26163 of 1947), 1274/5 (26175/6 of 1947), 1277/8 (26178/9 of 1947), 1280-4 (26181-5 of 1947). No. 1221 was observed at Cowlairs West Junction, bearing the name Sir Alexander Erskine Hill and still painted green and lettered L.N.E.R. This engine is now fitted with electric lighting | SLS/194803 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/01/1948 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1279 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26180 Allocated to Lincoln (LIN) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
22/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9862 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61279 |
||
03/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949. | ||
16/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1952. Dep: 15/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28413 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1954. Dep: 22/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28342 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1954. Dep: 31/05/1954. | ||
12/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
21/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
03/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1956. Dep: 07/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28234 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
10/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
08/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1958. Dep: 21/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28857 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
04/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1960. Dep: 22/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28597 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61279 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |