|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/11/1949 | 28/01/1950 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 9918 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61280 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1950 | 02/02/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1952 | 07/03/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28243 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/12/1952 | 24/01/1953 | 46 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 16/02/1954 | 02/04/1954 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28587 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 05/03/1956 | 21/04/1956 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28867 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/04/1958 | 01/06/1958 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28581 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 13/04/1960 | 27/05/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28432 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1960 | 23/07/1960 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1274 (9/1), 1275 (12/1), 1276 (14/1), 1277 (16/1), 1278 (19/1), 1279 (21/1), 1280 (23/1), 1281 (27/1), 1282 (28/1), 1283 (2/2), and 1284 (6/2). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1262 (26163 of 1947), 1274/5 (26175/6 of 1947), 1277/8 (26178/9 of 1947), 1280-4 (26181-5 of 1947). No. 1221 was observed at Cowlairs West Junction, bearing the name Sir Alexander Erskine Hill and still painted green and lettered L.N.E.R. This engine is now fitted with electric lighting | SLS/194803 |
21/11/1960 | G.E. Dieselisation | Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. | SLS/196101 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/01/1948 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1280 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26181 Allocated to Lincoln (LIN) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
27/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1949. Dep: 28/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9918 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61280 |
||
01/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1950. Dep: 02/02/1950. | ||
30/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1952. Dep: 07/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28243 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
20/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
10/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/12/1952. Dep: 24/01/1953. | ||
16/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1954. Dep: 02/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28587 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1956. Dep: 21/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28867 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1958. Dep: 01/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28581 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
08/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
12/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
13/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1960. Dep: 27/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28432 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
20/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/07/1960. Dep: 23/07/1960. | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
04/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61280 from March (31B) | ||
11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |