Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 163 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 163 Week
» 6297 Month
» 234181 Year
» 1455746 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1280 on 23/01/1948
BR 61280   28/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26181
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service Sun 23/01/1948 to Lincoln (LIN)
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 11/1963 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)
Service Life 14 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 11/63 for scrap to Central Wagon Co, Ince

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIN Lincoln (New) 23/01/1948
38A Colwick 06/04/1952
40A Lincoln 20/04/1952
30A Stratford 14/09/1952
30F Parkeston Quay 08/02/1959
31A Cambridge 12/04/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe 20/11/1960
31B March 04/02/1962
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW LIN Lincoln 23/01/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 26/11/1960
ALLOC 31B March 5w/e 10/03/1962
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/01/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9917)
28/01/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9918)
07/03/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28243)
02/04/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28587)
21/04/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28867)
01/06/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28581)
01/06/1958 Modified bogie springs fitted
27/05/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28432)
27/05/1960 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Queens Park Works Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1274 (9/1), 1275 (12/1), 1276 (14/1), 1277 (16/1), 1278 (19/1), 1279 (21/1), 1280 (23/1), 1281 (27/1), 1282 (28/1), 1283 (2/2), and 1284 (6/2). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1262 (26163 of 1947), 1274/5 (26175/6 of 1947), 1277/8 (26178/9 of 1947), 1280-4 (26181-5 of 1947). No. 1221 was observed at Cowlairs West Junction, bearing the name Sir Alexander Erskine Hill and still painted green and lettered L.N.E.R. This engine is now fitted with electric lighting SLS/194803
21/11/1960 G.E. Dieselisation Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. SLS/196101

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/11/1949 28/01/1950 63 days General
Boiler number 9918 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61280
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1950 02/02/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/01/1952 07/03/1952 38 days General
Boiler number 28243 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 10/12/1952 24/01/1953 46 days Heavy Casual  
Stratford Works 16/02/1954 02/04/1954 46 days General
Boiler number 28587 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 05/03/1956 21/04/1956 48 days General
Boiler number 28867 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 21/04/1958 01/06/1958 42 days General
Boiler number 28581 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Stratford Works 13/04/1960 27/05/1960 45 days General
Boiler number 28432 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 20/07/1960 23/07/1960 4 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/01/1948 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1280
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26181
Allocated to Lincoln (LIN)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
27/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1949. Dep: 28/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9918 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61280
   
01/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1950. Dep: 02/02/1950.    
30/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1952. Dep: 07/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28243 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
14/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/12/1952. Dep: 24/01/1953.    
16/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1954. Dep: 02/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28587 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1956. Dep: 21/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28867 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1958. Dep: 01/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28581 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
08/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
12/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
13/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1960. Dep: 27/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28432 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
20/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/07/1960. Dep: 23/07/1960.    
20/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
04/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61280 from March (31B)    

prev prev