Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 75 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2389 Week
» 13682 Month
» 278315 Year
» 1499880 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1281 on 27/01/1948
BR 61281   22/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26182
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service Sat 27/01/1948 to Lincoln (LIN)
Withdrawal Sat 19/02/1966 off Colwick (16B)
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Birds (Long Marston)
Service Life 18 yrs , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 5/66 for scrap to Birds, Long Marston

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIN Lincoln (New) on 27/01/1948
40B Immingham on 19/02/1956
38A Colwick on 01/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 19/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW LIN Lincoln on 27/01/1948
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 19/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
27/01/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9918)
22/12/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3699)
03/11/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28356)
28/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28409)
02/09/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28449)
14/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28291)
10/06/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28404)
09/03/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28859)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Queens Park Works Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1274 (9/1), 1275 (12/1), 1276 (14/1), 1277 (16/1), 1278 (19/1), 1279 (21/1), 1280 (23/1), 1281 (27/1), 1282 (28/1), 1283 (2/2), and 1284 (6/2). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1262 (26163 of 1947), 1274/5 (26175/6 of 1947), 1277/8 (26178/9 of 1947), 1280-4 (26181-5 of 1947). No. 1221 was observed at Cowlairs West Junction, bearing the name Sir Alexander Erskine Hill and still painted green and lettered L.N.E.R. This engine is now fitted with electric lighting SLS/194803
26/02/1962 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. SLS/196204
03/01/1966 Colwick MPD Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. SLS/196603

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/11/1949 22/12/1949 41 days General
Boiler number 3699 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61281
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1949 29/12/1949 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 29/08/1951 03/11/1951 67 days General
Boiler number 28356 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1951 10/11/1951 5 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 29/09/1953 28/10/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 28409 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 20/07/1955 02/09/1955 45 days General
Boiler number 28449 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 17/05/1957 14/06/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 28291 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 12/05/1959 10/06/1959 30 days General
Boiler number 28404 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 02/03/1960 14/03/1960 13 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 10/10/1960 01/11/1960 23 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 14/02/1962 09/03/1962 24 days General
Boiler number 28859 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 29/08/1963 11/09/1963 14 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/01/1948 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1281
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26182
Allocated to Lincoln (LIN)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
12/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1949. Dep: 22/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3699 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61281
   
23/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/12/1949. Dep: 29/12/1949.    
29/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1951. Dep: 03/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28356 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951.    
29/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1953. Dep: 28/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28409 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1955. Dep: 02/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28449 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
17/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1957. Dep: 14/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28291 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
12/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1959. Dep: 10/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28404 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1960. Dep: 14/03/1960.    
10/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1960. Dep: 01/11/1960.    
14/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1962. Dep: 09/03/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28859 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/08/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/08/1963. Dep: 11/09/1963.    
19/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 61281 from Colwick (16B)    

prev prev