Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 388 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6197 Week
» 13381 Month
» 321362 Year
» 1205743 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1283   02/02/1948
BR 61283   27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26184
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 02/02/1948 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962 off Stratford (30A)
Scrapping Mon 26/11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 14 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes 26/11/62 In for cutting up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick (New) 02/02/1948
LEI Leicester (G.C.) 06/11/1949
CLK Colwick 18/12/1949
38C Leicester (G.C.) 05/02/1950
38A Colwick 12/03/1950
38E Woodford Halse 07/11/1954
38A Colwick 20/02/1955
38C Leicester (G.C.) 15/11/1956
38A Colwick 09/12/1956
34A Kings Cross 05/05/1957
31A Cambridge 20/10/1957
32A Norwich Thorpe 20/11/1960
30A Stratford 10/09/1961
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW CLK Colwick 02/02/1948
ALLOC LEI Leicester (G.C.) w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 18/03/1950
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 3w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 26/11/1960
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/02/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9920)
01/07/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9919)
03/05/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28138)
19/09/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28237)
26/10/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28397)
25/04/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28549)
19/03/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28750)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/11/1948 27/11/1948 13 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 61283
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1949 01/07/1949 39 days General
Boiler number 9919 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1949 20/07/1949 2 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 29/03/1951 03/05/1951 36 days General
Boiler number 28138 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 27/02/1952 18/04/1952 52 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 22/08/1953 19/09/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 28237 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1953 22/11/1953 62 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/10/1955 26/10/1955 26 days General
Boiler number 28397 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 17/10/1956 24/10/1956 8 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 19/02/1957 15/03/1957 25 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 17/02/1958 25/04/1958 68 days General
Boiler number 28549 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 22/02/1960 19/03/1960 27 days General
Boiler number 28750 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/02/1948 To Service To service as LNER Number 1283
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26184
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
15/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1948. Dep: 27/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61283
   
24/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1949. Dep: 01/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9919 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/07/1949. Dep: 20/07/1949.    
06/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
12/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1951. Dep: 03/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28138 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/02/1952. Dep: 18/04/1952.    
22/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1953. Dep: 19/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28237 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1953. Dep: 22/11/1953.    
07/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
20/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
01/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1955. Dep: 26/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28397 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1956. Dep: 24/10/1956.    
15/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
09/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1957. Dep: 15/03/1957.    
05/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
20/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1958. Dep: 25/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28549 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1960. Dep: 19/03/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28750 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
10/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61283 from Stratford (30A)    
26/11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev