|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 11/01/1949 | 09/02/1949 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 01/07/1949 | 10/09/1949 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 5110 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61286 |
||
Stratford Works | 11/02/1951 | 07/04/1951 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 28542 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/05/1952 | 22/05/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 23/10/1952 | 13/12/1952 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 28534 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/11/1953 | 20/11/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 12/05/1954 | 25/06/1954 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28560 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 30/08/1954 | 10/09/1954 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 05/10/1955 | 06/01/1955 | -271 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 18/09/1956 | 26/10/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28544 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/07/1958 | 04/09/1958 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 28100 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 19/05/1959 | 05/06/1959 | 18 days | Light Casual | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1960 | 10/06/1960 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28980 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1961 | 16/12/1961 | 26 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows.-Nos.1285 9/2. 1286 (11/2), 1287 (13/2), 1288 (16/2), 1289 (18/2), 1290 (20/2), 1291 (24/2), 1292 (25/2), 1293 (27/2), 1294 (1/3), 1295 (3/3), 1296 (5/3), 1297 (10/3), 1298 (11/3), 1299 (12/3), 1300 (15/3), 1301 (17/3), 1302 (23/3) and 1303 (26/3). No. 1287 was the last to appear lettered L.N.E.R. No. 1288 and onwards have appeared with 'British Railways' on the tender in 9' high letters and the prefix letter 'E' in front of the number both on the cab side and the buffer beam; all lettering and numbering being in plain yellow Gill Sans style. This week's (3/4) deliveries are expected to appear as 61304 onwards. Further Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1285-93 (26186-94/47) and 1294- 1303 (26195-204/48), and up to No. 1303 all have appeared with the small cast L.N.E.R. number plates on the cab sides, dated 1947 and not pre fixed 'E.' | SLS/194805 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/02/1948 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1286 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26187 Allocated to Cambridge (CAM) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
11/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/01/1949. Dep: 09/02/1949. | ||
01/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5110 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61286 |
||
11/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1951. Dep: 07/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28542 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1952. Dep: 22/05/1952. | ||
23/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28534 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1953. Dep: 20/11/1953. | ||
12/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1954. Dep: 25/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28560 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1954. Dep: 10/09/1954. | ||
05/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1955. Dep: 06/01/1955. | ||
16/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
18/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1956. Dep: 26/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28544 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1958. Dep: 04/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28100 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
19/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/05/1959. Dep: 05/06/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
11/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1960. Dep: 10/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28980 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1961. Dep: 16/12/1961. | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61286 from March (31B) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |