Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1287   13/02/1948
BR 61287   01/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26188
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 13/02/1948 to Cambridge (CAM)
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 03/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 14 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 3/63 for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge (New) 13/02/1948
31B March 17/06/1962
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW CAM Cambridge 13/02/1948
ALLOC 31B March 2w/e 23/06/1962
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
13/02/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9924)
01/07/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9890)
21/04/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28546)
31/01/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28542)
20/11/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28527)
08/09/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28835)
25/07/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28821)
25/07/1958 Modified bogie springs fitted
03/03/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28203)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 19/05/1949 01/07/1949 44 days General
Boiler number 9890 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61287
 
Stratford Works 13/03/1951 21/04/1951 40 days General
Boiler number 28546 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 22/06/1951 29/06/1951 8 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 04/02/1952 04/04/1952 61 days Heavy Casual  
Stratford Works 15/12/1952 31/01/1953 48 days General
Boiler number 28542 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 29/06/1953 23/07/1953 25 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 05/08/1953 10/09/1953 37 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 24/03/1954 25/03/1954 2 days Weighing  
Stratford Works 11/10/1954 20/11/1954 41 days General
Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 07/08/1956 08/09/1956 33 days General
Boiler number 28835 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 15/05/1958 25/07/1958 72 days General
Boiler number 28821 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Doncaster Works 28/01/1960 03/03/1960 36 days General
Boiler number 28203 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/02/1948 To Service To service as LNER Number 1287
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26188
Allocated to Cambridge (CAM)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
19/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1949. Dep: 01/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9890 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61287
   
13/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1951. Dep: 21/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28546 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1951. Dep: 29/06/1951.    
04/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1952. Dep: 04/04/1952.    
15/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1952. Dep: 31/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28542 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1953. Dep: 23/07/1953.    
05/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1953. Dep: 10/09/1953.    
24/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Weighing) - Arr: 24/03/1954. Dep: 25/03/1954.    
11/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1956. Dep: 08/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28835 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1958. Dep: 25/07/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28821 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
28/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1960. Dep: 03/03/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28203 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61287 from March (31B)    
03/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev