|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 28/11/1949 | 17/12/1949 | 20 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61293 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/02/1952 | 23/02/1952 | 20 days | Light Intermediate | |||
30/10/1953 | 30/11/1953 | 32 days | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 22/03/1954 | 01/05/1954 | 41 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/09/1956 | 13/10/1956 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/10/1956 | 19/10/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/10/1956 | 01/11/1956 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/10/1957 | 02/11/1957 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/01/1958 | 25/01/1958 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/07/1958 | 16/08/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28223 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/07/1959 | 11/07/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/05/1961 | 24/06/1961 | 39 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/09/1963 | 30/11/1963 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 28280 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/02/1966 | 12/03/1966 | 18 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows.-Nos.1285 9/2. 1286 (11/2), 1287 (13/2), 1288 (16/2), 1289 (18/2), 1290 (20/2), 1291 (24/2), 1292 (25/2), 1293 (27/2), 1294 (1/3), 1295 (3/3), 1296 (5/3), 1297 (10/3), 1298 (11/3), 1299 (12/3), 1300 (15/3), 1301 (17/3), 1302 (23/3) and 1303 (26/3). No. 1287 was the last to appear lettered L.N.E.R. No. 1288 and onwards have appeared with 'British Railways' on the tender in 9' high letters and the prefix letter 'E' in front of the number both on the cab side and the buffer beam; all lettering and numbering being in plain yellow Gill Sans style. This week's (3/4) deliveries are expected to appear as 61304 onwards. Further Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1285-93 (26186-94/47) and 1294- 1303 (26195-204/48), and up to No. 1303 all have appeared with the small cast L.N.E.R. number plates on the cab sides, dated 1947 and not pre fixed 'E.' | SLS/194805 |
30/11/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. | SLS/195001 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/02/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 1293 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26194 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
28/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/11/1949. Dep: 17/12/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61293 |
||
04/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/02/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952. | ||
22/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954. | ||
05/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/09/1956. Dep: 13/10/1956. | ||
17/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1956. Dep: 19/10/1956. | ||
31/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/10/1956. Dep: 01/11/1956. | ||
18/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/10/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957. | ||
20/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/01/1958. Dep: 25/01/1958. | ||
09/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1958. Dep: 16/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28223 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/07/1959. Dep: 11/07/1959. | ||
17/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1961. Dep: 24/06/1961. | ||
30/09/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1963. Dep: 30/11/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28280 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/02/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1966. Dep: 12/03/1966. | ||
17/08/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61293 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
10/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |