|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 31/12/1948 | 10/01/1949 | 11 days | Light Casual | Tender Damaged |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1950 | 13/06/1950 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 9701 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61295 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1952 | 06/03/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28179 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28369 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1957 | 15/06/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28226 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1957 | 27/06/1957 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1958 | 02/10/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1960 | 24/03/1960 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28528 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1960 | 13/04/1960 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1961 | 10/11/1961 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1962 | 30/01/1962 | 16 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows.-Nos.1285 9/2. 1286 (11/2), 1287 (13/2), 1288 (16/2), 1289 (18/2), 1290 (20/2), 1291 (24/2), 1292 (25/2), 1293 (27/2), 1294 (1/3), 1295 (3/3), 1296 (5/3), 1297 (10/3), 1298 (11/3), 1299 (12/3), 1300 (15/3), 1301 (17/3), 1302 (23/3) and 1303 (26/3). No. 1287 was the last to appear lettered L.N.E.R. No. 1288 and onwards have appeared with 'British Railways' on the tender in 9' high letters and the prefix letter 'E' in front of the number both on the cab side and the buffer beam; all lettering and numbering being in plain yellow Gill Sans style. This week's (3/4) deliveries are expected to appear as 61304 onwards. Further Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1285-93 (26186-94/47) and 1294- 1303 (26195-204/48), and up to No. 1303 all have appeared with the small cast L.N.E.R. number plates on the cab sides, dated 1947 and not pre fixed 'E.' | SLS/194805 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/03/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 1295 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26196 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
26/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
02/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
31/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/12/1948. Dep: 10/01/1949. Work undertaken: Tender Damaged |
||
03/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1950. Dep: 13/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9701 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61295 |
||
10/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1952. Dep: 06/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28179 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
08/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28369 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1957. Dep: 15/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28226 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/06/1957. Dep: 27/06/1957. | ||
25/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/09/1958. Dep: 02/10/1958. | ||
12/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1960. Dep: 24/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28528 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
07/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1960. Dep: 13/04/1960. | ||
06/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/11/1961. Dep: 10/11/1961. | ||
15/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1962. Dep: 30/01/1962. | ||
25/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61295 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
07/02/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |