Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1025 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3124 Week
» 14695 Month
» 262988 Year
» 1147369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR (Tmp) E1300   15/03/1948
BR 61300   25/06/1949
DP (Dept) 23 m/e 12/1963

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26201
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Mon 15/03/1948 to March (MAR)
Withdrawal Mon 25/11/1963 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)
Service Life 15 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys
Information Transferred to Departmental Stock for use as a stationary boiler for train heating purposes. Drawhook removed to preclude use as a normal engine.

Notes
Notes Made S B Dept'l N023
Sold 1/66 for scrap to Garnham, Harris & Elton, Chesterfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March (New) 15/03/1948
CAM Cambridge 21/03/1949
30E Colchester 14/12/1958
30A Stratford 06/12/1959
31B March 13/12/1959
31A Cambridge 10/01/1960
31B March 17/06/1962
   Withdrawn 25/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 31B March 2w/e 23/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/03/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9937)
25/06/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9889)
22/03/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28539)
10/01/1953 Modified bogie springs fitted
10/01/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28504)
16/10/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28557)
19/10/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28452)
28/11/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28349)
26/06/1959 BTH speed indicator fitted
26/06/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
03/06/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28542)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 03/12/1948 23/12/1948 21 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 16/05/1949 25/06/1949 41 days General
Boiler number 9889 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61300
 
Stratford Works 04/02/1951 22/03/1951 47 days General
Boiler number 28539 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 17/06/1952 21/06/1952 5 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 17/11/1952 10/01/1953 55 days General
Boiler number 28504 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Stratford Works 09/11/1953 02/12/1953 24 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 13/09/1954 16/10/1954 34 days General
Boiler number 28557 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 19/03/1956 23/03/1956 5 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 10/09/1956 19/10/1956 40 days General
Boiler number 28452 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 03/10/1958 28/11/1958 57 days General
Boiler number 28349 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 10/06/1959 26/06/1959 17 days Unclassified
BTH speed indicator fitted
 
Stratford Works 19/06/1960 22/06/1960 4 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 04/05/1961 03/06/1961 31 days General
Boiler number 28542 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 13/08/1962 01/09/1962 20 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/03/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 1300
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26201
Allocated to March (MAR)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
03/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1948. Dep: 23/12/1948.    
21/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
16/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9889 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61300
   
04/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1951. Dep: 22/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28539 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/06/1952. Dep: 21/06/1952.    
17/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28504 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
09/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1953. Dep: 02/12/1953.    
13/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28557 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1956. Dep: 23/03/1956.    
10/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1956. Dep: 19/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28452 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1958. Dep: 28/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28349 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
10/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1959. Dep: 26/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
BTH speed indicator fitted
   
06/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1960. Dep: 22/06/1960.    
04/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1961. Dep: 03/06/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28542 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
13/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/08/1962. Dep: 01/09/1962.    
25/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61300 from March (31B)    
12/1963 Renumbered Renumbered to 23    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield    

prev prev