Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 14 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6860 Week
» 18407 Month
» 418089 Year
» 494676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61306   05/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26207
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sat 05/04/1948 to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Withdrawal Sat 30/09/1967 off Low Moor (55J)
Service Life 19 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 1/2/68 for preservation in working condition

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) 05/04/1948
HLB Hull Botanic Gardens 16/05/1948
53A Hull Dairycoates 14/06/1959
56F Low Moor 25/06/1967
   Withdrawn 30/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates 05/04/1948
ALLOC HLB Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 22/05/1948
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 15/07/1967
WDN   30/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/04/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9943)
18/04/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3604)
09/04/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28420)
05/01/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28430)
17/09/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28281)
29/05/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28752)
31/12/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28117)
31/12/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
05/10/1960 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
28/10/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28547)
28/05/1964 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28285)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 07/02/1950 18/04/1950 71 days General
Boiler number 3604 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 24/04/1950 28/04/1950 5 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 24/10/1950 15/11/1950 23 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 17/03/1952 09/04/1952 24 days General
Boiler number 28420 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 12/03/1953 21/03/1953 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/04/1953 02/05/1953 13 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 09/12/1953 05/01/1954 28 days General
Boiler number 28430 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 09/08/1955 17/09/1955 40 days General
Boiler number 28281 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 20/03/1956 09/04/1956 21 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 30/01/1957 08/02/1957 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/05/1957 29/05/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 28752 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 11/08/1958 15/08/1958 5 days Unclassified
New smokebox door
 
Darlington Works 01/12/1958 31/12/1958 31 days General
Boiler number 28117 (Diagram 100A)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 26/07/1960 05/10/1960 72 days Light Casual
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 05/10/1961 28/10/1961 24 days General
Boiler number 28547 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 16/04/1964 28/05/1964 43 days General
Boiler number 28285 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/04/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 61306
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26207
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
16/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB)    
07/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1950. Dep: 18/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3604 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/04/1950. Dep: 28/04/1950.    
24/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/10/1950. Dep: 15/11/1950.    
17/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 09/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28420 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953.    
20/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 02/05/1953.    
09/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1953. Dep: 05/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28430 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28281 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1956. Dep: 09/04/1956.    
30/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/01/1957. Dep: 08/02/1957.    
01/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1957. Dep: 29/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28752 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1958. Dep: 15/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
New smokebox door
   
01/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1958. Dep: 31/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28117 (Diagram 100A)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
26/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/07/1960. Dep: 05/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
05/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1961. Dep: 28/10/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28547 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/04/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1964. Dep: 28/05/1964.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28285 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
30/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 61306 from Low Moor (55J)    

prev prev