Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 106 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 3705 Week
» 9839 Month
» 237723 Year
» 1459288 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61312 on 23/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26213
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service Sun 23/04/1948 to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Withdrawal Sun 01/03/1964 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Cohens (Ickles)
Service Life 15 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 5/64 for scrap to G Cohen, Ickles, Rotherham

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Darnall (New) 23/04/1948
32A Norwich Thorpe 03/10/1954
32D Yarmouth South Town 29/01/1956
32A Norwich Thorpe 01/04/1956
41A Sheffield Darnall 03/05/1959
41H Staveley (G.C.) 20/09/1959
41D Canklow 03/01/1960
41A Sheffield Darnall 10/09/1961
41H Staveley (G.C.) 23/09/1962
34A Kings Cross 10/03/1963
41F Mexborough 16/06/1963
   Withdrawn 01/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW SHF Sheffield Darnall 23/04/1948
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 28/04/1956
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 29/06/1963
WDN   01/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/04/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9949)
19/11/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9916)
19/04/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28422)
30/01/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28848)
03/08/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28201)
14/11/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28579)
01/08/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28108)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Queens Park Works Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61304 (31/3), 61305 (1/4), 61306 (5/4), 61307 (7/4), 61308 (9/4), 61309 (15/4), 61310 (19/4), 61311 (21/4), 61312 (23/4), 61313 (27/4), 61314 (28/4) and 61315 (W/E 1/5) leaving only twenty-four to come. Additional Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61305-09 (26206-10/48) and 61311-15 (26212-16/48). The 35 new 'L.1's' to be built at the Q.P. Works have been allotted Nos. 67731-65, while the 70 'K.1's ' which are also to be built there have been allotted Nos. 62001-70. SLS/194806
19/04/1958 Cromer MPD The allocation at Beach shed is-B12/3, 61514/6/42/7/68 and B1 61312; the latter works usually on the Melton Constable branch and the B12's on Norwich trains. SLS/195805
16/07/1961 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. SLS/196109

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/10/1949 19/11/1949 34 days General
Boiler number 9916 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1949 28/11/1949 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 26/03/1952 19/04/1952 25 days General
Boiler number 28422 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1953 30/01/1954 57 days General
Boiler number 28848 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1954 08/02/1954 7 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 27/05/1956 03/08/1956 69 days General
Boiler number 28201 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 30/09/1958 14/11/1958 46 days General
Boiler number 28579 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 29/06/1961 01/08/1961 34 days General
Boiler number 28108 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/04/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 61312
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26213
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
17/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9916 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1949. Dep: 28/11/1949.    
26/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28422 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1953. Dep: 30/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28848 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1954. Dep: 08/02/1954.    
03/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
01/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
27/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1956. Dep: 03/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28201 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1958. Dep: 14/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28579 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
20/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
29/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1961. Dep: 01/08/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28108 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
10/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
01/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61312 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev