|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/10/1948 | 30/10/1948 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 02/01/1950 | 11/02/1950 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 9935 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1950 | 20/02/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 03/02/1952 | 08/03/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28568 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1954 | 03/11/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28837 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1956 | 08/08/1956 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28537 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/08/1958 | 25/09/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 10834 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1960 | 05/01/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28522 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/04/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61314 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26215 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
03/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
09/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
25/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1948. Dep: 30/10/1948. | ||
02/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 11/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9935 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1950. Dep: 20/02/1950. | ||
03/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28568 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1954. Dep: 03/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28837 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1956. Dep: 08/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28537 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
11/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1958. Dep: 25/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10834 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
11/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1960. Dep: 05/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28522 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61314 from New England (34E) | ||
04/03/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |