|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inverurie Works | 13/07/1948 | 15/07/1948 | 3 days | Unclassified | Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/03/1950 | 14/04/1950 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/05/1952 | 14/06/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28605 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/04/1954 | 22/05/1954 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/06/1954 | 09/06/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/12/1954 | 25/12/1954 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/04/1955 | 13/05/1955 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/06/1956 | 18/08/1956 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 28634 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1958 | 04/02/1958 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 01/07/1958 | 25/07/1958 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 27/10/1958 | 12/12/1958 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 10812 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1961 | 19/08/1961 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28953 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61316 (4/5), 61317 (6/5), 61318 (11/5), 61319 (14/5), 61320 (18/5), 61321 (20/5), 61322 (25/5) and 61323 (27/5). Further Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61316-19 (26217-20/48), 61321-23 (26222-24/48). | SLS/194807 |
01/02/1960 | Peterborough Midland Closure | Peterborough Midland (31F) closed as from 1st February and the engines were transferred as follows-to March D2239, 11156/7, 41949, 44152/273, 44509/21, 47300, 61095/6, 61156/204/5/323/48, 62613, 64789, 64901, 90063/447/501/28. To New England (34E) 43127; Grimesthorpe (41B) 44097/518; remainder returned to LMR viz. 43957, 44110/239/47/476/519/22. | SLS/196003 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/05/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61323 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26224 Allocated to Kittybrewster (KIT) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
13/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/07/1948. Dep: 15/07/1948. Work undertaken: Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
16/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/03/1950. Dep: 14/04/1950. | ||
10/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1952. Dep: 14/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28605 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/04/1954. Dep: 22/05/1954. | ||
07/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1954. Dep: 09/06/1954. | ||
01/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1954. Dep: 25/12/1954. | ||
19/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1955. Dep: 13/05/1955. | ||
27/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1956. Dep: 18/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28634 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
24/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1958. Dep: 04/02/1958. | ||
01/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1958. Dep: 25/07/1958. | ||
27/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1958. Dep: 12/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10812 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
19/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1961. Dep: 19/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28953 (Diagram 100A) |
||
1963 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 24 but not taken up | ||
25/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61323 from March (31B) | ||
17/02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |