|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/09/1948 | 23/10/1948 | 49 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1950 | 11/03/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 9864 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1950 | 20/04/1950 | 36 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1951 | 17/04/1951 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1952 | 17/05/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28429 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1953 | 23/03/1953 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1953 | 03/10/1953 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 28559 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1954 | 25/12/1954 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1955 | 13/07/1955 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28225 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1955 | 01/11/1955 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1957 | 15/03/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28240 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1958 | 21/10/1958 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1958 | 23/01/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28403 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1961 | 29/06/1961 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28544 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61324 (1/6), 61325 (3/6), 61326 (8/6), 61327 (11/6), 61328 (16/6), 61329 (18/6), 61330 (23/6), 61331 (25/6), 61332 (30/6). No. 61315 was ex Works on 30/4. Further Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61324-25 (26225-26/48), 61327-33 (26228-34/48). | SLS/194808 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster MPD (Shed) | Ex-Works on Doncaster (36A) Shed: 60013, 61327, 61985, 70005. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/06/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61327 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26228 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
05/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/09/1948. Dep: 23/10/1948. | ||
19/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
25/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
12/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1950. Dep: 11/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9864 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1950. Dep: 20/04/1950. | ||
28/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 17/04/1951. | ||
20/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28429 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1953. Dep: 23/03/1953. | ||
15/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28559 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/12/1954. Dep: 25/12/1954. | ||
17/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1955. Dep: 13/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28225 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1955. Dep: 01/11/1955. | ||
13/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1957. Dep: 15/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28240 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/10/1958. Dep: 21/10/1958. | ||
19/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1958. Dep: 23/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28403 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1961. Dep: 29/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28544 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
14/02/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61327 from Canklow (41D) | ||
04/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Marples and Gillot: Sheffield |