|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 04/09/1949 | 22/10/1949 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 9907 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 25/02/1950 | 30/03/1950 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 05/05/1951 | 21/07/1951 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 28559 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1953 | 09/05/1953 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 28844 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1953 | 14/05/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/05/1955 | 25/06/1955 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/11/1957 | 03/01/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28618 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1959 | 18/05/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/06/1960 | 13/08/1960 | 52 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61324 (1/6), 61325 (3/6), 61326 (8/6), 61327 (11/6), 61328 (16/6), 61329 (18/6), 61330 (23/6), 61331 (25/6), 61332 (30/6). No. 61315 was ex Works on 30/4. Further Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61324-25 (26225-26/48), 61327-33 (26228-34/48). | SLS/194808 |
25/03/1950 | Stratford Works | One of the two 0-4-0T tram engines-No. 68083- has just been through shops. The crest is on the undercarriage, below the wooden body. One of the 0-6-0T tram engines has the words 'British Railways' in the same position, and does not look as neat. Locomotives in the new shops were Nos. 61004/42/50/54/89, 61332/35. 1639. 62531, 3040. 63101, 7160, 68527, 69704, 90013, 90502. ex-W.D. 77013, 79312 and outside awaiting shopping were Nos. 61235, 61559, 8386, 8647, 9684, 90392. The three Crane locomotives are now renumbered; No. 68667 noted 3/49, No. 68668 2/50 and No. 68669 3/50 (with crest). These dates are not given in the official lists, and the actual dates will be slightly earlier. In the Paint Shop were Nos. 61540 (lined), 61554. 68088, 68225, 68651, 69641, 69728; and in the old Works Nos. 61058, 61336, 61558, 62509, 2584, 2601. 62790, 2794, 4644/83, 65462, 65545/57, 7155, 7226, 8375, 8519/61, 8772, 8874/81, 9639/69. | SLS/195005 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/06/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61332 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26233 Allocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
||
11/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
17/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
04/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9907 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1950. Dep: 30/03/1950. | ||
05/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1951. Dep: 21/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28559 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28844 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1953. Dep: 14/05/1953. | ||
13/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
26/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/05/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955. | ||
29/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1957. Dep: 03/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28618 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1959. Dep: 18/05/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
23/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/06/1960. Dep: 13/08/1960. | ||
12/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61332 from Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |