Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61333   02/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26234
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sat 02/07/1948 to Cambridge (CAM)
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 07/1963 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 14 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Notes
Notes 7/63 In for cutting up at Cowlairs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge (New) 02/07/1948
NOR Norwich Thorpe 11/07/1948
CAM Cambridge 15/08/1948
HAY Haymarket 29/08/1948
CAM Cambridge 15/11/1948
64A St Margarets 13/09/1953
64F Bathgate 31/01/1954
65A Eastfield 19/04/1954
61A Kittybrewster 09/06/1954
64A St Margarets 17/07/1957
64B Haymarket 21/10/1957
65A Eastfield 26/01/1959
65C Parkhead 12/03/1959
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW CAM Cambridge 02/07/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/07/1948
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC HAY Haymarket w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 20/11/1948
LOAN 64A St Margarets 4w/e 03/10/1953
LOAN 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 15/05/1954
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 15/05/1954
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 15/09/1956
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 64B Haymarket 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 14/02/1959
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 14/03/1959
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/07/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9970)
15/09/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28544)
27/03/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28538)
24/08/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28519)
29/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28645)
25/04/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
25/04/1959 Modified bogie springs fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 14/11/1949 14/01/1950 62 days General  
Stratford Works 30/07/1951 15/09/1951 48 days General
Boiler number 28544 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 02/02/1953 27/03/1953 54 days General
Boiler number 28538 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 28/04/1953 24/08/1953 119 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28519 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 01/09/1955 15/10/1955 45 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 27/02/1956 17/03/1956 20 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 12/01/1957 25/01/1957 14 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 27/05/1957 29/06/1957 34 days General
Boiler number 28645 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 30/12/1957 31/12/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 04/04/1959 25/04/1959 22 days Light Intermediate
Modified bogie springs fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/07/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 61333
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26234
Allocated to Cambridge (CAM)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
11/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
15/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
29/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
15/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
14/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1949. Dep: 14/01/1950.    
30/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1951. Dep: 15/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28544 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1953. Dep: 27/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28538 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1953. Dep: 24/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28519 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
31/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
19/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
09/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
01/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/09/1955. Dep: 15/10/1955.    
27/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/02/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956.    
12/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1957. Dep: 25/01/1957.    
27/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1957. Dep: 29/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28645 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
21/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
30/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/12/1957. Dep: 31/12/1957.    
26/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
12/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
04/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/04/1959. Dep: 25/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61333 from Parkhead (65C)    
07/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev