Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 468 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6222 Week
» 34180 Month
» 68822 Year
» 1290387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61343   04/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1001
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Thu 04/02/1949 to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Withdrawal Thu 03/03/1966 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 17 yrs , 27 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 4/66 for scrap to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap Co, Wishaw

Allocations
Code Name From Date
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill (New) 04/02/1949
61A Kittybrewster 16/05/1949
62A Thornton Junction 24/03/1959
   Withdrawn 03/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 04/02/1949
ALLOC KIT Kittybrewster w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 11/04/1959
WDN   03/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/02/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5127)
14/11/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28644)
21/04/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28703)
22/04/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28613)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Cowlairs Works 26/10/1950 23/11/1950 29 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 18/12/1950 13/01/1951 27 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 05/10/1953 14/11/1953 41 days General
Boiler number 28644 (Diagram 100A)
 
Inverurie Works 14/01/1954 14/01/1954 1 day Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 10/08/1955 03/09/1955 25 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 14/01/1956 04/02/1956 22 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 19/03/1956 21/04/1956 34 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28703 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 24/08/1957 20/09/1957 28 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 21/11/1958 13/12/1958 23 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 23/04/1959 16/05/1959 24 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 23/02/1961 22/04/1961 59 days General
Boiler number 28613 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 05/12/1963 18/01/1964 45 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/02/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 61343
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number 1001
Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
16/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
26/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 26/10/1950. Dep: 23/11/1950.    
18/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/12/1950. Dep: 13/01/1951.    
14/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/08/1952. Dep: 13/09/1952.    
05/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28644 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1954. Dep: 14/01/1954.    
10/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/08/1955. Dep: 03/09/1955.    
14/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1956. Dep: 04/02/1956.    
19/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1956. Dep: 21/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28703 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/08/1957. Dep: 20/09/1957.    
21/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958.    
24/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
23/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/04/1959. Dep: 16/05/1959.    
23/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1961. Dep: 22/04/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28613 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/12/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/12/1963. Dep: 18/01/1964.    
03/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 61343 from Thornton Junction (62A)    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev