05/03/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 61344 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number 1002 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
|
|
23/03/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/03/1951. Dep: 13/04/1951. |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1952. Dep: 16/02/1952. |
|
|
21/02/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/02/1952. Dep: 28/02/1952. |
|
|
23/03/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28625 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
29/04/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/04/1954. Dep: 17/06/1954. |
|
|
20/01/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/01/1955. Dep: 29/01/1955. |
|
|
30/11/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/11/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955. |
|
|
20/03/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 20/03/1956. Dep: 28/04/1956. |
|
|
30/05/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/05/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957. |
|
|
28/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
06/03/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1958. Dep: 05/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28207 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
20/04/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1959. Dep: 27/04/1959. |
|
|
07/07/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/07/1960. Dep: 20/08/1960. |
|
|
20/12/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1960. Dep: 24/12/1960. |
|
|
13/03/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/03/1961. Dep: 16/03/1961. |
|
|
13/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
10/09/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/09/1962. Dep: 21/09/1962. |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1963. Dep: 17/08/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28431 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
24/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
23/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61344 from Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|