Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 808 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2923 Week
» 25429 Month
» 328619 Year
» 1550184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 61345 on 08/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1003
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service Thu 08/04/1949 to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Withdrawal Thu 14/07/1966 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Campbells (Airdrie)
Service Life 17 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 9/66 for scrap to G H Campbell, Airdrie

Allocations
Code Name From Date
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill (New) on 08/04/1949
61A Kittybrewster on 16/05/1949
64A St Margarets on 19/06/1961
   Withdrawn on 14/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 08/04/1949
ALLOC KIT Kittybrewster w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   on 14/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/04/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5129)
13/07/1949 Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
12/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28637)
06/07/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28636)
30/06/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28702)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Inverurie Works 12/07/1949 13/07/1949 2 days Unclassified
Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
 
Cowlairs Works 05/10/1951 30/10/1951 26 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 30/11/1951 28/12/1951 29 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 14/09/1953 12/10/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 28637 (Diagram 100A)
 
Inverurie Works 11/03/1954 11/03/1954 1 day Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 22/09/1955 29/10/1955 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 19/03/1956 29/03/1956 11 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 30/05/1957 06/07/1957 38 days General
Boiler number 28636 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 12/09/1958 23/10/1958 42 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 24/09/1959 07/10/1959 14 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 26/04/1960 18/06/1960 54 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 30/08/1960 12/10/1960 44 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 29/05/1962 30/06/1962 33 days General
Boiler number 28702 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 03/07/1964 15/07/1964 13 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 26/02/1965 20/03/1965 23 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/04/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 61345
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number 1003
Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
16/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
12/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/07/1949. Dep: 13/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
   
05/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/10/1951. Dep: 30/10/1951.    
30/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/11/1951. Dep: 28/12/1951.    
14/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1953. Dep: 12/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28637 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1954. Dep: 11/03/1954.    
22/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/09/1955. Dep: 29/10/1955.    
19/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1956. Dep: 29/03/1956.    
30/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28636 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/09/1958. Dep: 23/10/1958.    
24/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1959. Dep: 07/10/1959.    
26/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 26/04/1960. Dep: 18/06/1960.    
30/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1960. Dep: 12/10/1960.    
19/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
29/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1962. Dep: 30/06/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28702 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/07/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1964. Dep: 15/07/1964.    
26/02/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1965. Dep: 20/03/1965.    
14/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 61345 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev