Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 754 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2869 Week
» 25375 Month
» 328565 Year
» 1550130 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 61346 on 30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1004
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service Mon 30/04/1949 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Mon 08/06/1964 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping During 08/1964 at P.W. McLellan (Langloan)
Service Life 15 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 8/64 for scrap to P & W McLellan, Langloan

Allocations
Code Name From Date
61A Kittybrewster (New) on 30/04/1949
KEI Keith on 09/01/1950
61A Kittybrewster on 21/12/1950
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 19/06/1961
62A Thornton Junction on 26/12/1962
   Withdrawn on 08/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW KIT Kittybrewster on 30/04/1949
ALLOC 61C   w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 7w/e 29/12/1962
WDN   on 08/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/04/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5130)
03/08/1949 Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
12/12/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28648)
14/05/1955 WPU Gear removed
18/04/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28650)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Inverurie Works 02/08/1949 03/08/1949 2 days Unclassified
Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
 
Cowlairs Works 27/09/1951 18/10/1951 22 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 11/02/1952 01/04/1952 51 days Heavy Casual  
Cowlairs Works 26/10/1953 12/12/1953 48 days General
Boiler number 28648 (Diagram 100A)
 
Inverurie Works 20/04/1954 20/04/1954 1 day Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 18/04/1955 14/05/1955 27 days Light Intermediate
WPU Gear removed
 
Cowlairs Works 24/04/1957 30/05/1957 37 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 01/11/1957 23/11/1957 23 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 13/03/1959 18/04/1959 37 days General
Boiler number 28650 (Diagram 100A)
 
Inverurie Works 12/12/1960 13/01/1961 33 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 14/07/1961 02/09/1961 51 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 11/04/1963 19/04/1963 9 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 17/07/1963 18/07/1963 2 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/08/1961 Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D2708/70/4, 44783, 45213, 45361, 61324/46/96, 65919, 80030, 90017, 90386, 90463, 90614. Valve Shop: 73077. Stripping Shop: 65923. Weigh House: 64847. Paint Shop: 73099. Works Yard: D2434, D2726, D3393, 44485, 61178, 64932, 72009, 73005, 80045, 90753. Scrap Yard: 64710 intact, 64700 being out-up. Works Shunters: D2760, D3418. SLS/196110
14/04/1963 Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. SLS/196304
20/07/1963 Inverurie Works (Shopped) Shopped during six weeks ended 20th July: 42273, 45176, 61076/346/402, 64549, 65267/323/908/22/6, D5340, D6140/5/6. Scrapped in same period-57607, 64795/946/86, 65261, 67668, 68445/79. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 61346
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number 1004
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
02/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1949. Dep: 03/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
   
09/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (KEI)    
21/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
27/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1951. Dep: 18/10/1951.    
11/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1952. Dep: 01/04/1952.    
26/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28648 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1954. Dep: 20/04/1954.    
18/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/04/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
WPU Gear removed
   
24/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 30/05/1957.    
01/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/11/1957. Dep: 23/11/1957.    
13/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1959. Dep: 18/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28650 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/12/1960. Dep: 13/01/1961.    
19/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
14/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/07/1961. Dep: 02/09/1961.    
26/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
11/04/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1963. Dep: 19/04/1963.    
17/07/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/07/1963. Dep: 18/07/1963.    
08/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61346 from Thornton Junction (62A)    

prev prev