Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 490 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4126 Week
» 23771 Month
» 58413 Year
» 1279978 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61347   21/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1005
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Tue 21/05/1949 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Tue 04/04/1967 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping Fri 07/07/1967 at P.W. McLellan (Langloan)
Service Life 17 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 7/7/67 for scrap to P & W McLellan, Langloan

Allocations
Code Name From Date
61A Kittybrewster (New) 21/05/1949
KEI Keith 09/01/1950
61A Kittybrewster 21/12/1950
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 19/06/1961
64C Dalry Road 09/08/1964
64A St Margarets 04/10/1965
62A Thornton Junction 24/04/1966
   Withdrawn 04/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW KIT Kittybrewster 21/05/1949
ALLOC 61C   w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 5w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 5w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN   04/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/05/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5131)
14/12/1949 Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
29/05/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28639)
15/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28185)
21/12/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28648)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Inverurie Works 12/12/1949 14/12/1949 3 days Unclassified
Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
 
Cowlairs Works 06/11/1951 01/12/1951 26 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 26/04/1954 29/05/1954 34 days General
Boiler number 28639 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 07/06/1954 10/06/1954 4 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 15/03/1955 18/03/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 07/06/1955 02/07/1955 26 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 28/01/1956 10/03/1956 43 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 10/05/1957 15/06/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 28185 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 02/12/1958 27/12/1958 26 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 08/10/1960 19/11/1960 43 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 23/11/1962 21/12/1962 29 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28648 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 25/01/1965 13/03/1965 48 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 16/06/1965 03/07/1965 18 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 04/08/1965 07/08/1965 4 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 29/10/1965 20/11/1965 23 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/05/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 61347
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number 1005
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
12/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1949. Dep: 14/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
   
09/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (KEI)    
21/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
06/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/11/1951. Dep: 01/12/1951.    
26/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1954. Dep: 29/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28639 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1954. Dep: 10/06/1954.    
15/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955.    
07/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955.    
28/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/01/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956.    
10/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1957. Dep: 15/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28185 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/12/1958. Dep: 27/12/1958.    
08/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/10/1960. Dep: 19/11/1960.    
19/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
23/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1962. Dep: 21/12/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28648 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
25/01/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/01/1965. Dep: 13/03/1965.    
16/06/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/06/1965. Dep: 03/07/1965.    
04/08/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/08/1965. Dep: 07/08/1965.    
04/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
29/10/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/10/1965. Dep: 20/11/1965.    
24/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
04/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 61347 from Thornton Junction (62A)    
07/07/1967 Scrapped Broken up by McLellans: Langloan    

prev prev