Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61348   09/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1006
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 09/06/1949 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Sun 26/12/1965 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)
Service Life 16 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 2/66 for scrap to Garnham, Harris & Elton, Chesterfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
61A Kittybrewster (New) 09/06/1949
35C Spital Bridge 25/02/1957
31B March 31/01/1960
40A Lincoln 03/04/1960
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/01/1964
36A Doncaster 13/06/1965
36C Frodingham 11/07/1965
40E Colwick 14/11/1965
   Withdrawn 26/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW KIT Kittybrewster 09/06/1949
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 9w/e 08/02/1964
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 24/07/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   w/e 26/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/06/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5132)
23/12/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28632)
10/11/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28610)
08/04/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28854)
08/04/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
25/08/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28183)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Cowlairs Works 27/02/1951 19/03/1951 21 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 26/11/1952 23/12/1952 28 days General
Boiler number 28632 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 17/09/1954 23/10/1954 37 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 01/11/1954 06/11/1954 6 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 11/07/1955 13/07/1955 3 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 02/08/1955 10/09/1955 40 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 24/11/1955 17/12/1955 24 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 13/10/1956 10/11/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 28610 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 04/05/1957 14/05/1957 11 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 23/09/1957 28/09/1957 6 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 17/02/1959 08/04/1959 51 days General
Boiler number 28854 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 06/12/1960 09/12/1960 4 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 26/07/1961 25/08/1961 31 days General
Boiler number 28183 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 09/04/1963 09/05/1963 31 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 13/09/1963 28/09/1963 16 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/06/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 61348
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number 1006
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
27/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/02/1951. Dep: 19/03/1951.    
26/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1952. Dep: 23/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28632 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/09/1954. Dep: 23/10/1954.    
01/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954.    
11/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1955. Dep: 13/07/1955.    
02/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/08/1955. Dep: 10/09/1955.    
24/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955.    
13/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1956. Dep: 10/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28610 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
04/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/05/1957. Dep: 14/05/1957.    
23/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957.    
17/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1959. Dep: 08/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28854 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
06/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1960. Dep: 09/12/1960.    
26/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1961. Dep: 25/08/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28183 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/04/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/04/1963. Dep: 09/05/1963.    
13/09/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/09/1963. Dep: 28/09/1963.    
05/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
08/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Retford (G.C.) shed (Thrumpton): Dead on shed John Thickitt Link
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
14/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
26/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 61348 from Colwick (40E)    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield    

prev prev