02/07/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 61349 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number 1007 Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
|
|
21/11/1949 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/11/1949. Dep: 23/11/1949. |
|
|
13/03/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/03/1951. Dep: 03/04/1951. |
|
|
22/09/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 11/10/1952. |
|
|
13/05/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953. |
|
|
07/06/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1953. Dep: 10/07/1953. |
|
|
23/09/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1953. Dep: 25/09/1953. |
|
|
15/04/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1954. Dep: 29/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28647 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
28/05/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/05/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955. |
|
|
09/02/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956. |
|
|
09/02/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/02/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957. |
|
|
18/03/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/03/1957. Dep: 20/03/1957. |
|
|
22/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
01/10/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1958. Dep: 31/10/1958. |
|
|
07/11/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1958. Dep: 11/11/1958. |
|
|
13/03/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/03/1959. Dep: 24/03/1959. |
|
|
13/03/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/03/1961. Dep: 28/04/1961. |
|
|
26/10/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1961. Dep: 15/11/1961. |
|
|
14/05/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1962. Dep: 26/05/1962. |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/12/1962. Dep: 12/01/1963. |
|
|
25/05/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1963. Dep: 29/06/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28618 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
01/07/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/07/1965. Dep: 21/08/1965. |
|
|
24/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
17/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61349 from Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|