Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 164 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5918 Week
» 33876 Month
» 68518 Year
» 1290083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61350   28/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2072
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sat 28/07/1949 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Sat 19/11/1966
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 17 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 12/66 for scrap to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap Co, Wishaw

Allocations
Code Name From Date
61A Kittybrewster (New) 28/07/1949
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 19/06/1961
64A St Margarets 16/05/1962
   Withdrawn 19/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW KIT Kittybrewster 28/07/1949
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 09/06/1962
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN   19/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/07/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3874)
03/07/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28654)
04/08/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28613)
25/01/1964 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28518)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Inverurie Works 08/11/1949 10/11/1949 3 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 01/09/1951 18/09/1951 18 days Heavy Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 17/06/1952 19/06/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 05/07/1952 10/07/1952 6 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 06/11/1952 07/11/1952 2 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 26/05/1954 03/07/1954 39 days General
Boiler number 28654 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 08/10/1955 12/11/1955 36 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 19/06/1956 04/08/1956 47 days General
Boiler number 28613 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 21/08/1956 23/08/1956 3 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 22/11/1957 21/12/1957 30 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 20/03/1958 05/04/1958 17 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 18/04/1958 01/05/1958 14 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 07/11/1958 29/11/1958 23 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 09/05/1960 25/06/1960 48 days General  
Cowlairs Works 20/05/1963 22/06/1963 34 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 30/10/1963 07/12/1963 39 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 13/12/1963 25/01/1964 44 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28518 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/07/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 61350
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2072
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
08/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1949. Dep: 10/11/1949.    
01/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/09/1951. Dep: 18/09/1951.    
17/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/06/1952. Dep: 19/06/1952.    
05/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1952. Dep: 10/07/1952.    
06/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/11/1952. Dep: 07/11/1952.    
26/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28654 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1955. Dep: 12/11/1955.    
19/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1956. Dep: 04/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28613 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1956. Dep: 23/08/1956.    
22/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/11/1957. Dep: 21/12/1957.    
20/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1958. Dep: 05/04/1958.    
18/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/04/1958. Dep: 01/05/1958.    
07/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 07/11/1958. Dep: 29/11/1958.    
09/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1960. Dep: 25/06/1960.    
19/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
16/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
20/05/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1963. Dep: 22/06/1963.    
30/10/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1963. Dep: 07/12/1963.    
13/12/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/12/1963. Dep: 25/01/1964.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28518 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 61350    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev