|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 30/11/1949 | 02/12/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/08/1951 | 07/09/1951 | 36 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/11/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28640 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/01/1956 | 18/02/1956 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/03/1956 | 14/04/1956 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1956 | 03/10/1956 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/11/1957 | 07/01/1958 | 40 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/09/1958 | 20/09/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/02/1959 | 05/03/1959 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28647 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/06/1959 | 18/06/1959 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/08/1959 | 10/09/1959 | 24 days | Light Casual | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/10/1961 | 17/11/1961 | 28 days | Light Intermediate | |||
14/02/1963 | 01/03/1963 | 16 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/10/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61358 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2080 Allocated to St Margarets (64A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
30/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1949. Dep: 02/12/1949. | ||
03/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 03/08/1951. Dep: 07/09/1951. | ||
20/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28640 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956. | ||
14/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1956. Dep: 14/04/1956. | ||
19/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1956. Dep: 03/10/1956. | ||
02/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
29/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/11/1957. Dep: 07/01/1958. | ||
13/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958. | ||
07/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1959. Dep: 05/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28647 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
02/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1959. Dep: 18/06/1959. | ||
18/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1959. Dep: 10/09/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
21/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 21/10/1961. Dep: 17/11/1961. | ||
25/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61358 from Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |