Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61360   22/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L997
Works Number 26819
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 22/03/1950 to Stratford (30A)
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 16 yrs , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 5/66 for scrap to G Cohen, Kettering

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30A Stratford (New) 22/03/1950
30E Colchester 06/01/1957
31A Cambridge 12/04/1959
36A Doncaster 01/11/1959
   Withdrawn 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 30A Stratford 22/03/1950
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
22/03/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 10810)
12/01/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28572)
14/11/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28536)
04/02/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28515)
04/07/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28577)
04/07/1958 Modified bogie springs fitted
12/11/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28184)
12/09/1963 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28858)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 05/12/1951 12/01/1952 39 days General
Boiler number 28572 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 08/10/1953 14/11/1953 38 days General
Boiler number 28536 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 07/11/1955 04/02/1956 90 days General
Boiler number 28515 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 08/04/1957 17/04/1957 10 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 14/05/1958 04/07/1958 52 days General
Boiler number 28577 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Doncaster Works 17/10/1960 12/11/1960 27 days General
Boiler number 28184 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 29/07/1963 12/09/1963 46 days General
Boiler number 28858 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/03/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 61360
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26819
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
05/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1951. Dep: 12/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28572 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28536 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1955. Dep: 04/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28515 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
08/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/04/1957. Dep: 17/04/1957.    
14/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1958. Dep: 04/07/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28577 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
12/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
01/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1960. Dep: 12/11/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28184 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/07/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1963. Dep: 12/09/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28858 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 61360 from Doncaster (36A)    
08/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev