Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 854 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4402 Week
» 5292 Month
» 313273 Year
» 1197654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61367   28/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L997
Works Number 26826
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 28/04/1950 to Colwick (38A)
Withdrawal Sun 22/08/1965 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping Tue 28/12/1965 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)
Service Life 15 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 9/65 for scrap to Hughes, Bolckow, North Blyth

Allocations
Code Name From Date
38A Colwick (New) 28/04/1950
38E Woodford Halse 27/05/1951
38A Colwick 30/12/1951
38C Leicester (G.C.) 27/01/1952
38A Colwick 27/04/1952
34A Kings Cross 05/05/1957
35A New England 20/10/1957
34F Grantham 14/06/1959
36A Doncaster 08/09/1963
   Withdrawn 22/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 38A Colwick 28/04/1950
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse w/e 02/06/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 34D Hitchin (GNR) 4w/e 28/03/1958
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   w/e 22/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/04/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 10817)
12/01/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28700)
17/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28429)
05/05/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28461)
04/09/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28463)
01/11/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28585)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 11/12/1951 12/01/1952 33 days General
Boiler number 28700 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/09/1953 17/10/1953 36 days General
Boiler number 28429 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 12/04/1955 05/05/1955 24 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28461 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 29/12/1955 24/01/1956 27 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 30/01/1956 31/01/1956 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/08/1958 04/09/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 28463 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 04/10/1961 01/11/1961 29 days General
Boiler number 28585 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/04/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 61367
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26826
Allocated to Colwick (38A)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
27/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
11/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1951. Dep: 12/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28700 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
27/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
27/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
12/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1953. Dep: 17/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28429 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 12/04/1955. Dep: 05/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28461 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/12/1955. Dep: 24/01/1956.    
30/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/01/1956. Dep: 31/01/1956.    
05/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
20/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
07/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1958. Dep: 04/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28463 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
04/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1961. Dep: 01/11/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28585 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 61367 from Doncaster (36A)    
28/12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth    

prev prev