Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 290 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6653 Week
» 9235 Month
» 273868 Year
» 1495433 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61369 on 16/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L997
Works Number 26828
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service Sat 16/05/1950 to Colwick (38A)
Withdrawal Sat 21/12/1963 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping During 02/1965 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 13 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 12/64 for scrap to T W Ward, Killamarsh

Allocations
Code Name From Date
38A Colwick (New) 16/05/1950
38C Leicester (G.C.) 12/10/1952
26B Agecroft 03/10/1959
2F Woodford Halse 21/07/1962
9G Gorton 17/11/1962
   Withdrawn 21/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 38A Colwick 16/05/1950
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 01/11/1952
LOAN 15E Leicester (G.C.) 01/02/1958
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 23/02/1958
LOAN 26B Agecroft 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 01/12/1962
WDN   w/e 21/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/05/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 10819)
10/11/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28234)
31/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28242)
22/07/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28291)
01/05/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28194)
31/03/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28240)
01/03/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28596)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 18/10/1951 10/11/1951 24 days General
Boiler number 28234 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 10/07/1952 11/07/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 26/09/1953 31/10/1953 36 days General
Boiler number 28242 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 25/06/1955 22/07/1955 28 days General
Boiler number 28291 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 01/04/1957 01/05/1957 31 days General
Boiler number 28194 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 28/11/1958 05/01/1959 39 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 27/02/1959 31/03/1959 33 days General
Boiler number 28240 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 23/11/1959 04/12/1959 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/02/1961 01/03/1961 29 days General
Boiler number 28596 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/05/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 61369
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26828
Allocated to Colwick (38A)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
18/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28234 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/07/1952. Dep: 11/07/1952.    
12/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
26/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28242 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1955. Dep: 22/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28291 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1957. Dep: 01/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28194 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/11/1958. Dep: 05/01/1959.    
27/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1959. Dep: 31/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28240 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
23/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1959. Dep: 04/12/1959.    
01/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1961. Dep: 01/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28596 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
21/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61369 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev