Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61371   24/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L997
Works Number 26830
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 24/10/1950 to Lincoln (40A)
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 11 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 3/63 for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge

Allocations
Code Name From Date
40A Lincoln (New) 24/10/1950
31A Cambridge 23/10/1955
31B March 17/06/1962
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 40A Lincoln 24/10/1950
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 31B March 2w/e 23/06/1962
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/10/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 10821)
27/11/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28818)
10/12/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28163)
08/12/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28579)
10/10/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28537)
10/10/1958 Modified bogie springs fitted
17/04/1959 BTH speed indicator fitted
17/04/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
30/09/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28110)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 30/10/1952 27/11/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 28818 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 15/11/1954 10/12/1954 26 days General
Boiler number 28163 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 22/10/1956 08/12/1956 48 days General
Boiler number 28579 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 01/09/1958 10/10/1958 40 days General
Boiler number 28537 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Stratford Works 05/01/1959 20/01/1959 16 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 03/04/1959 17/04/1959 15 days Unclassified
BTH speed indicator fitted
 
Doncaster Works 19/08/1960 30/09/1960 43 days General
Boiler number 28110 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/10/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 61371
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26830
Allocated to Lincoln (40A)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
30/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1952. Dep: 27/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28818 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1954. Dep: 10/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28163 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
22/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1956. Dep: 08/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28579 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1958. Dep: 10/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28537 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
05/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1959. Dep: 20/01/1959.    
03/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/04/1959. Dep: 17/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
BTH speed indicator fitted
   
19/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1960. Dep: 30/09/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28110 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61371 from March (31B)    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev