|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 10/11/1952 | 24/12/1952 | 45 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 11/10/1954 | 13/11/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28871 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/12/1956 | 08/02/1957 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28101 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/02/1959 | 03/04/1959 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 28114 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 18/03/1960 | 23/03/1960 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 08/08/1960 | 12/08/1960 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1960 | 25/08/1960 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1962 | 10/02/1962 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28145 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Paint shop) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/02/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61375 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26834 Allocated to Immingham (40B) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
10/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1952. Dep: 24/12/1952. | ||
11/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1954. Dep: 13/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28871 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1956. Dep: 08/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28101 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1959. Dep: 03/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28114 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
18/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/03/1960. Dep: 23/03/1960. | ||
08/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1960. Dep: 12/08/1960. | ||
22/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1960. Dep: 25/08/1960. | ||
11/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1962. Dep: 10/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28145 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
25/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61375 from March (31B) | ||
12/1963 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 24 | ||
08/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |