|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 11/09/1952 | 22/09/1952 | 12 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28449 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1953 | 25/04/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28843 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1955 | 12/02/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28441 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1956 | 15/10/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28233 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1956 | 24/10/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1956 | 01/11/1956 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1957 | 06/09/1957 | 59 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1958 | 20/10/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28565 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1958 | 07/11/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1960 | 02/06/1960 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28230 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
22/10/1959 | Leicester GC MPD | Only four Bls now remain viz. 61111/36, 61376/81; others having moved to Agecroft (26B) in exchange for LM Class 5s, the latest arrivals being 44932, 45116 (still with Sc. R. numbering), 45234 an 45450. | SLS/195912 |
31/12/1961 | Leicester GC | V2s 60815/50/63/90 have been placed in store and replaced by Bls 61077/1177/1206. B1 61381 an 40167 are also in store here. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/09/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61381 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26840 Allocated to Colwick (38A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
25/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
01/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
11/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/09/1952. Dep: 22/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28449 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28843 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
07/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
14/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28441 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
14/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1956. Dep: 15/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28233 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/10/1956. Dep: 24/10/1956. | ||
26/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/10/1956. Dep: 01/11/1956. | ||
10/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1957. Dep: 06/09/1957. | ||
17/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1958. Dep: 20/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28565 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/10/1958. Dep: 07/11/1958. | ||
02/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1960. Dep: 02/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28230 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
17/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
19/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
01/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61381 from Gorton (9G) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |