Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61392   27/12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L997
Works Number 26851
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 27/12/1951 to New England (35A)
Withdrawal Sun 20/06/1965 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 10/1965 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 13 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 8/65 for scrap to T W Ward, Killamarsh

Allocations
Code Name From Date
35A New England (New) 27/12/1951
30A Stratford 24/03/1956
31A Cambridge 25/03/1956
35A New England 07/10/1956
35B Grantham 06/10/1957
36A Doncaster 08/09/1963
40B Immingham 14/06/1964
41D Canklow 10/01/1965
40E Colwick 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 20/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 35A New England 27/12/1951
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 40B Immingham 3w/e 04/07/1964
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 20/06/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 2w/e 26/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
27/12/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 10842)
19/01/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28755)
03/12/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28754)
01/02/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28532)
06/10/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28278)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 09/12/1953 19/01/1954 42 days General
Boiler number 28755 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 09/11/1955 03/12/1955 25 days General
Boiler number 28754 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 15/02/1956 28/02/1956 14 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 03/01/1958 01/02/1958 30 days General
Boiler number 28532 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 25/07/1960 06/08/1960 13 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 23/08/1962 06/10/1962 45 days General
Boiler number 28278 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/12/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 61392
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26851
Allocated to New England (35A)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
09/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1953. Dep: 19/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28755 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28754 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1956. Dep: 28/02/1956.    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
07/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
06/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
03/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1958. Dep: 01/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28532 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/07/1960. Dep: 06/08/1960.    
23/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1962. Dep: 06/10/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28278 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
14/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
10/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
20/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 61392 from Colwick (40E)    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev