Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 728 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14134 Week
» 67150 Month
» 186677 Year
» 3213530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
61397 |
on |
13/03/1952 |
Notes
Notes |
Sold 6/8/65 for scrap to Shipbreaking Industries, Faslane |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
64A |
St Margarets |
on |
13/03/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
13/03/1952 |
Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 10847) |
09/06/1956 |
Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28437) |
06/05/1959 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
06/05/1959 |
Modified bogie springs fitted |
17/12/1960 |
Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28701) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Cowlairs Works |
|
07/06/1954 |
03/07/1954 |
27 days |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
Cowlairs Works |
|
23/04/1956 |
09/06/1956 |
48 days |
General |
Boiler number 28437 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
Cowlairs Works |
|
21/06/1956 |
23/06/1956 |
3 days |
Unclassified |
|
|
Cowlairs Works |
|
14/04/1958 |
17/05/1958 |
34 days |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
Cowlairs Works |
|
10/12/1958 |
31/12/1958 |
22 days |
Light Casual |
|
|
Cowlairs Works |
|
21/04/1959 |
06/05/1959 |
16 days |
Unclassified |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
|
|
Cowlairs Works |
|
11/11/1960 |
17/12/1960 |
37 days |
General |
Boiler number 28701 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
Cowlairs Works |
|
03/02/1962 |
16/02/1962 |
14 days |
Unclassified |
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
19/10/1962 |
14/12/1962 |
57 days |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/11/1962 |
Inverurie Works (In shops) |
In shops : 42262/9, 61397, 65910, 80093, D260, D6142/4/7. Ex Works 45461, 64595. Scrapped in last 4 weeks-44008/253, 47168, 47536, 57331/613, 65313, 69204. Awaiting scrap: 44254, 57378, 64478, 90513. |
SLS/196212 |
04/01/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Shopped) |
Shopped: 42262/9, D361, D6142 an 61397. Scrapped: 69135/50, 69224. Being Scrapped: 65334, 68101. In Shops: 64592/7, D261/3. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/03/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 61397 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26856 Allocated to St Margarets (64A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
|
|
07/06/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 07/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. |
|
|
23/04/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1956. Dep: 09/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28437 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
21/06/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956. |
|
|
14/04/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/04/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958. |
|
|
10/12/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/12/1958. Dep: 31/12/1958. |
|
|
21/04/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/04/1959. Dep: 06/05/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
|
|
|
11/11/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28701 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/02/1962. Dep: 16/02/1962. |
|
|
19/10/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/10/1962. Dep: 14/12/1962. |
|
|
26/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61397 from St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
09/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |
|
|