Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 187 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5941 Week
» 33899 Month
» 68541 Year
» 1290106 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 61400   30/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2102
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Thu 30/03/1950 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Thu 17/12/1964 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 14 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 2/65 for scrap to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap Co, Wishaw

Allocations
Code Name From Date
61A Kittybrewster (New) 30/03/1950
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 19/06/1961
64C Dalry Road 09/08/1964
62A Thornton Junction 05/10/1964
   Withdrawn 17/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster 30/03/1950
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 5w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 6w/e 07/11/1964
WDN   17/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/03/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 4047)
25/09/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28877)
15/08/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28651)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Cowlairs Works 04/02/1952 28/02/1952 25 days Light Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 23/02/1954 23/02/1954 1 day Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 18/08/1954 25/09/1954 39 days General
Boiler number 28877 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 20/02/1956 24/03/1956 34 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 13/04/1956 14/04/1956 2 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 07/03/1957 23/03/1957 17 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 19/02/1958 22/03/1958 32 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 04/07/1959 15/08/1959 43 days General
Boiler number 28651 (Diagram 100A)
 
Inverurie Works 20/05/1960 01/06/1960 13 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 10/01/1961 27/01/1961 18 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 03/08/1961 28/09/1961 57 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 27/11/1963 10/01/1964 45 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/03/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 61400
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2102
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
04/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/02/1952. Dep: 28/02/1952.    
23/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 23/02/1954.    
18/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1954. Dep: 25/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28877 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1956. Dep: 24/03/1956.    
13/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1956. Dep: 14/04/1956.    
07/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1957. Dep: 23/03/1957.    
19/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/02/1958. Dep: 22/03/1958.    
04/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1959. Dep: 15/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28651 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1960. Dep: 01/06/1960.    
10/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/01/1961. Dep: 27/01/1961.    
19/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
03/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/08/1961. Dep: 28/09/1961.    
27/11/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/11/1963. Dep: 10/01/1964.    
09/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
05/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
17/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61400 from Thornton Junction (62A)    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev