|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1952 | 02/02/1952 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Inverurie Works | 25/06/1952 | 26/06/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/02/1953 | 21/02/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/10/1953 | 31/10/1953 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Inverurie Works | 12/04/1954 | 12/04/1954 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/10/1954 | 13/11/1954 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28662 (Diagram 100A) WPU Gear removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/12/1955 | 07/01/1956 | 22 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/01/1957 | 02/02/1957 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/11/1958 | 13/12/1958 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 28617 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/05/1959 | 27/05/1959 | 8 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/05/1960 | 28/05/1960 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/11/1961 | 16/12/1961 | 25 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/03/1961 | Grangemouth MPD | Two B1s are now allocated-61401/3. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/04/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61401 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2103 Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
11/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952. | ||
25/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/06/1952. Dep: 26/06/1952. | ||
16/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1953. Dep: 21/02/1953. | ||
08/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/10/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953. | ||
12/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1954. Dep: 12/04/1954. | ||
04/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1954. Dep: 13/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28662 (Diagram 100A) WPU Gear removed |
||
17/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/12/1955. Dep: 07/01/1956. | ||
15/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
08/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/01/1957. Dep: 02/02/1957. | ||
25/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28617 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1959. Dep: 27/05/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
13/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
27/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1960. Dep: 28/05/1960. | ||
03/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) | ||
16/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
22/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 22/11/1961. Dep: 16/12/1961. | ||
17/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61401 from Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |