|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 23/05/1950 | 27/05/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1950 | 16/06/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1951 | 15/09/1951 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 28342 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1952 | 18/06/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1952 | 05/12/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28311 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1953 | 08/07/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 8 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28179 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1955 | 07/04/1955 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1956 | 26/01/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28807 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1958 | 31/01/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28563 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1960 | 29/10/1960 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28356 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1961 | 23/10/1961 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1963 | 09/08/1963 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 28269 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Yard) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/05/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61406 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2108 Allocated to Lincoln (40A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
23/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/05/1950. Dep: 27/05/1950. | ||
15/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1950. Dep: 16/06/1950. | ||
08/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1951. Dep: 15/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28342 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 18/06/1952. Dep: 18/06/1952. | ||
11/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1952. Dep: 05/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28311 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/07/1953. Dep: 08/07/1953. | ||
28/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28179 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/03/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955. | ||
29/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1956. Dep: 26/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28807 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1958. Dep: 31/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28563 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28356 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/10/1961. Dep: 23/10/1961. | ||
30/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1963. Dep: 09/08/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28269 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/02/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/04/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61406 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |