|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/02/1922 | 01/04/1922 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1923 | 11/08/1923 | 50 days | General | Ex works in full GC livery (only touched up) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1924 | 31/01/1925 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1712 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6165 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1925 | 18/04/1925 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1925 | 14/11/1925 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1927 | 04/06/1927 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1928 | 15/09/1928 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1928 | 13/10/1928 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1930 | 07/06/1930 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1931 | 07/11/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1933 | 27/05/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1933 | 14/05/1933 | 15 days | Light Repair | Side screens fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1934 | 18/08/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1935 | 12/10/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1937 | 08/05/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1938 | 15/10/1938 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1942 | 30/05/1942 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1944 | 27/05/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1946 | 15/06/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3033 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1947 | 31/12/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1920 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1165, name: VALOUR Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
25/02/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1922. Dep: 01/04/1922. | ||
23/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1923. Dep: 11/08/1923. Work undertaken: Ex works in full GC livery (only touched up) |
||
11/08/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
15/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1924. Dep: 31/01/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1712 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6165 |
||
11/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1925. Dep: 18/04/1925. | ||
06/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
31/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925. | ||
27/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
28/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13) |
||
14/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1928. Dep: 15/09/1928. | ||
13/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/10/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928. | ||
15/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
12/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930. | ||
24/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1931. Dep: 07/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13) |
||
14/11/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
03/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
21/04/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
29/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1933. Dep: 27/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/04/1933. Dep: 14/05/1933. Work undertaken: Side screens fitted |
||
21/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13) |
||
06/12/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/02/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
14/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935. | ||
07/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
10/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13) |
||
28/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
25/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
18/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/03/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
04/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1942. Dep: 30/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 13) |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. | ||
24/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
16/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1482 but not taken up | ||
04/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3033 (Diagram 13) |
||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1496 | ||
01/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
31/12/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1496 from Lincoln (LIN) | ||
31/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947. |