Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 109 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2970 Week
» 20306 Month
» 298102 Year
» 1182483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1166 m/e 08/1920
LNER (1924) 6166   07/06/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1483   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1497   28/09/1946
BR 61497   24/04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
08/1920 EARL HAIG

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B3/108/1920
B3/231/12/1929
B3/309/10/1943
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1920 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Thu 14/04/1949 off Immingham (IMM)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 28 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 08/1920
DON Doncaster 20/07/1923
KX Kings Cross 26/07/1923
GOR Gorton 13/02/1924
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 30/06/1924
KX Kings Cross 12/11/1924
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 04/10/1925
KX Kings Cross 27/11/1925
GOR Gorton 12/02/1927
NEA Neasden 23/10/1927
GOR Gorton 09/10/1928
NEA Neasden 05/11/1928
GOR Gorton 11/03/1933
NEA Neasden 12/12/1935
GOR Gorton 08/10/1943
NEA Neasden 01/11/1945
IMM Immingham 14/07/1947
   Withdrawn 14/04/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham 14/07/1947
WDN IMM Immingham 14/04/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1920 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1847)
07/06/1924 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 534)
06/10/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1935)
31/12/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 397)
07/02/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 8)
27/02/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1846)
11/03/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 274)
07/04/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 571)
10/08/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1933)
26/12/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 242)
04/11/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1932)
09/10/1943 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9428)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/01/1922 25/03/1922 57 days General  
Gorton Works 26/05/1923 16/06/1923 22 days Light Repair
Valves & pistons
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1924 07/06/1924 106 days General
Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6166
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1925 07/11/1925 92 days General  
Gorton Works 20/11/1926 12/02/1927 85 days General  
Gorton Works 03/09/1927 24/09/1927 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 23/06/1928 06/10/1928 106 days General
Boiler number 1935 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1929 31/12/1929 74 days General
Rebuilt to class B3/2
Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1930 19/04/1930 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 15/11/1930 22/11/1930 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 17/01/1931 07/02/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 8 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1931 05/09/1931 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 30/01/1932 27/02/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1933 11/03/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 274 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1934 07/04/1934 43 days General
Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1934 08/12/1934 1 day Light Repair
Lubricator position changed
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1935 10/08/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 1933 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1936 26/12/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1937 27/02/1937 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 07/05/1938 02/07/1938 57 days General  
Gorton Works 14/10/1939 04/11/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1940 19/10/1940 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 11/06/1941 28/06/1941 18 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 02/02/1943 09/10/1943 250 days General
Nameplate removed
Boiler number 9428 (Diagram 100A)
De-named EARL HAIG
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1944 04/03/1944 10 days Light Repair
Frame cracked
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1944 03/06/1944 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 06/01/1945 06/01/1945 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 07/07/1945 25/08/1945 50 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 30/11/1946 25/01/1947 57 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 18/10/1947 18/10/1947 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 03/04/1948 24/04/1948 22 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 61497
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1948 18/09/1948 15 days Light Repair  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1920 To Service To service as GCR Number 1166, name: EARL HAIG
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
28/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1922. Dep: 25/03/1922.    
26/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/05/1923. Dep: 16/06/1923.
Work undertaken:
Valves & pistons
   
20/07/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
26/07/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
13/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
23/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 07/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6166
   
30/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
12/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
08/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1925. Dep: 07/11/1925.    
04/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
27/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
20/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1926. Dep: 12/02/1927.    
12/02/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/09/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927.    
23/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
23/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 06/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1935 (Diagram 13)
   
09/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/11/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
19/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 31/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B3/2
Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13)
   
05/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 19/04/1930.    
15/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930.    
17/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1931. Dep: 07/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8 (Diagram 13)
   
15/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/08/1931. Dep: 05/09/1931.    
30/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1932. Dep: 27/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
   
18/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1933. Dep: 11/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 274 (Diagram 13)
   
11/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1934. Dep: 07/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
   
08/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Lubricator position changed
   
13/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 10/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1933 (Diagram 13)
   
12/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
28/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1936. Dep: 26/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13)
   
27/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937.    
07/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938.    
14/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13)
   
19/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940.    
11/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941.    
02/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Nameplate removed
Boiler number 9428 (Diagram 100A)
De-named EARL HAIG
   
08/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Frame cracked
   
27/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944.    
06/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 06/01/1945.    
07/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945.    
01/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1483 but not taken up    
28/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1497    
30/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/11/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947.    
14/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
18/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 18/10/1947.    
03/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1948. Dep: 24/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61497
   
04/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948.    
14/04/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 61497 from Immingham (IMM)    

prev prev