|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 28/01/1922 | 25/03/1922 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1923 | 16/06/1923 | 22 days | Light Repair | Valves & pistons |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1924 | 07/06/1924 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6166 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1925 | 07/11/1925 | 92 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1926 | 12/02/1927 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1927 | 24/09/1927 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1928 | 06/10/1928 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 1935 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1929 | 31/12/1929 | 74 days | General | Rebuilt to class B3/2 Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1930 | 19/04/1930 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1930 | 22/11/1930 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1931 | 07/02/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1931 | 05/09/1931 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1932 | 27/02/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1933 | 11/03/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 274 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1934 | 07/04/1934 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1934 | 08/12/1934 | 1 day | Light Repair | Lubricator position changed |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1935 | 10/08/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1933 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1936 | 26/12/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1937 | 27/02/1937 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1938 | 02/07/1938 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1939 | 04/11/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1940 | 19/10/1940 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1941 | 28/06/1941 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1943 | 09/10/1943 | 250 days | General | Nameplate removed Boiler number 9428 (Diagram 100A) De-named EARL HAIG |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1944 | 04/03/1944 | 10 days | Light Repair | Frame cracked |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1944 | 03/06/1944 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1945 | 06/01/1945 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 50 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 57 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1947 | 18/10/1947 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1948 | 24/04/1948 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61497 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1948 | 18/09/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1920 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1166, name: EARL HAIG Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
28/01/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1922. Dep: 25/03/1922. | ||
26/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/05/1923. Dep: 16/06/1923. Work undertaken: Valves & pistons |
||
20/07/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/07/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
13/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
23/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 07/06/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6166 |
||
30/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
12/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
08/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1925. Dep: 07/11/1925. | ||
04/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
27/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
20/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1926. Dep: 12/02/1927. | ||
12/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
03/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/09/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927. | ||
23/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
23/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 06/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1935 (Diagram 13) |
||
09/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
19/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 31/12/1929. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B3/2 Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 19/04/1930. | ||
15/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930. | ||
17/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1931. Dep: 07/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8 (Diagram 13) |
||
15/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/08/1931. Dep: 05/09/1931. | ||
30/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1932. Dep: 27/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13) |
||
18/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1933. Dep: 11/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 274 (Diagram 13) |
||
11/03/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1934. Dep: 07/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13) |
||
08/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934. Work undertaken: Lubricator position changed |
||
13/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 10/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1933 (Diagram 13) |
||
12/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
28/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1936. Dep: 26/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937. | ||
07/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938. | ||
14/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13) |
||
19/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940. | ||
11/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941. | ||
02/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943. Work undertaken: Nameplate removed Boiler number 9428 (Diagram 100A) De-named EARL HAIG |
||
08/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944. Work undertaken: Frame cracked |
||
27/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944. | ||
06/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 06/01/1945. | ||
07/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. | ||
01/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1483 but not taken up | ||
28/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1497 | ||
30/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/11/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. | ||
14/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
18/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 18/10/1947. | ||
03/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1948. Dep: 24/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61497 |
||
04/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948. | ||
14/04/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61497 from Immingham (IMM) |