|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/07/1922 | 26/08/1922 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1923 | 30/08/1923 | 11 days | Unclassified | After removal of nameplates at Kings Cross shed |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1924 | 05/07/1924 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1847 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6167 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1925 | 21/11/1925 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1924 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1927 | 30/07/1927 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1928 | 01/12/1928 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 1930 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1930 | 08/03/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1931 | 27/06/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1933 | 04/03/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1924 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1934 | 21/04/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1936 | 28/03/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 300 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1938 | 25/06/1938 | 78 days | General | Rebuilt to class B3/2 Boiler number 579 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1939 | 17/06/1939 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1940 | 01/06/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1943 | 31/07/1943 | 52 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1946 | 21/09/1946 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1498 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1947 | 31/12/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1920 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1167, name: LLOYD GEORGE Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
29/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1922. Dep: 26/08/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13) |
||
02/08/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
20/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1923. Dep: 30/08/1923. Work undertaken: After removal of nameplates at Kings Cross shed |
||
09/1923 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1167C | ||
12/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
26/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1847 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6167 |
||
05/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
05/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
05/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1925. Dep: 21/11/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1924 (Diagram 13) |
||
12/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
07/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1927. Dep: 30/07/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13) |
||
18/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1928. Dep: 01/12/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1930 (Diagram 13) |
||
14/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
08/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930. | ||
30/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13) |
||
16/07/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
16/12/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
18/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1933. Dep: 04/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1924 (Diagram 13) |
||
31/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13) |
||
01/02/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
01/03/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
07/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 300 (Diagram 13) |
||
09/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B3/2 Boiler number 579 (Diagram 13) |
||
29/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
27/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939. | ||
20/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1940. Dep: 01/06/1940. | ||
10/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1484 but not taken up | ||
27/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1498 |
||
26/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
31/12/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1498 from Immingham (IMM) | ||
31/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947. |