Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 233 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 233 Week
» 17569 Month
» 295365 Year
» 1179746 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1095 m/e 06/1906
LNER (1924) 6095   21/02/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1490   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B4/206/1906
B4/108/10/1927
B4/328/10/1939
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9458
Works Number 4816
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Thu 10/02/1944 off Ardsley (ARD)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Withdrawn 3/7/39 but CME order No 953 for repair issued 11/9/39

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 08/12/1922
MEX Mexborough m/e 01/1924
DON Doncaster 02/06/1924
GOR Gorton 19/02/1925
NWE New England 16/05/1925
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 19/01/1926
NEA Neasden 24/10/1932
IMM Immingham 15/12/1932
MAR March 09/05/1933
LIN Lincoln m/e 09/1935
IMM Immingham 07/07/1937
LIN Lincoln 02/09/1937
   Withdrawn 03/07/1939
GOR Gorton (Reinstated) (Reinstated for war effort - repairs authorised on 11/9/39) 28/10/1939
LIN Lincoln 29/10/1939
LNG Langwith Junction 16/08/1942
DON Doncaster 21/11/1942
LNG Langwith Junction 29/11/1942
ARD Ardsley 20/02/1943
   Withdrawn 10/02/1944

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1906 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1205)
11/05/1907 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1207)
04/02/1911 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1214)
22/11/1913 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 835)
09/10/1920 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 498)
08/10/1927 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 801)
28/05/1932 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 128)
03/06/1933 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 684)
26/01/1935 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 922)
25/04/1936 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 55)
25/12/1937 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 684)
28/10/1939 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 797)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 30/03/1907 11/05/1907 43 days General
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1910 04/02/1911 75 days General
Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1913 22/11/1913 36 days General
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1920 09/10/1920 36 days General
Boiler number 498 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1922 30/09/1922 85 days General  
Gorton Works 29/11/1924 21/02/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6095
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1927 08/10/1927 92 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/1
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1930 17/05/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 23/04/1932 28/05/1932 36 days General
Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1933 03/06/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1934 04/08/1934 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 12/01/1935 26/01/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/04/1936 25/04/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1936 06/06/1936 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/12/1937 25/12/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1939 28/10/1939 22 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/3
Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1942 31/01/1942 26 days General  
Gorton Works 10/02/1944 10/02/1944 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as GCR Number 1095
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4816
Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted
   
30/03/1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1907. Dep: 11/05/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
22/11/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1910. Dep: 04/02/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
18/10/1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1913. Dep: 22/11/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
04/09/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1920. Dep: 09/10/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 498 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
08/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1922. Dep: 30/09/1922.    
08/12/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1924. Dep: 21/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6095
   
19/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/05/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
19/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
09/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/1
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
05/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930.    
23/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1932. Dep: 28/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
24/10/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
15/12/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/05/1933 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
20/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
28/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/07/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934.    
12/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1935. Dep: 26/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
09/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
04/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1936. Dep: 25/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
23/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 06/06/1936.    
07/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
02/09/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
04/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1937. Dep: 25/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
07/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1939. Dep: 28/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/3
Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
28/10/1939 Reinstated Reinstated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
06/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1942. Dep: 31/01/1942.    
16/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
20/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
10/02/1944 Withdrawn Condemned as 6095 from Ardsley (ARD)    
10/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 10/02/1944. Dep: 10/02/1944.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1490 but not taken up    

prev