Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1096 m/e 06/1906
LNER (1924) 6096   26/04/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1491   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1481   07/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B4/206/1906
B4/421/05/1938
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9458
Works Number 4817
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Fri 04/07/1947 off Lincoln (LIN)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 08/12/1922
NWE New England 29/05/1925
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 20/01/1926
LIN Lincoln 08/07/1939
LNG Langwith Junction 09/08/1942
LIN Lincoln 16/08/1942
   Withdrawn 04/07/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN LIN Lincoln 04/07/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1906 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1206)
03/03/1911 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1207)
04/07/1914 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1214)
07/08/1915 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 834)
03/07/1920 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1434)
19/11/1927 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 802)
13/08/1932 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 922)
15/09/1934 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 132)
31/10/1936 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 681)
30/11/1940 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 923)
17/10/1942 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 127)
21/07/1945 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 55)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 13/01/1911 03/03/1911 50 days General
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1914 04/07/1914 62 days General
Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1915 07/08/1915 71 days General
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1920 03/07/1920 57 days General
Boiler number 1434 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1922 21/10/1922 64 days General  
Gorton Works 01/03/1924 26/04/1924 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6096
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1927 19/11/1927 85 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1929 25/01/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 26/07/1930 16/08/1930 22 days General
New 19in S.V. cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1932 13/08/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1934 15/09/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/10/1936 31/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/04/1938 21/05/1938 29 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/4
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1940 30/11/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1942 17/10/1942 23 days General
Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1945 21/07/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1946 02/11/1946 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/07/1947 04/07/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as GCR Number 1096
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4817
Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted
   
13/01/1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1911. Dep: 03/03/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
04/05/1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1914. Dep: 04/07/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
29/05/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1915. Dep: 07/08/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
08/05/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1434 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
19/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1922. Dep: 21/10/1922.    
08/12/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
01/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 26/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6096
   
29/05/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
20/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
27/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 19/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
14/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1929. Dep: 25/01/1930.    
26/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
New 19in S.V. cylinders fitted
   
23/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1932. Dep: 13/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
18/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 15/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
17/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
23/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1938. Dep: 21/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/4
   
08/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
16/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
09/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
16/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
25/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
16/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1491 but not taken up    
07/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1481    
26/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946.    
04/07/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1481 from Lincoln (LIN)    
04/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/07/1947. Dep: 04/07/1947.    

prev prev