Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 683 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4282 Week
» 10416 Month
» 238300 Year
» 1459865 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1097 m/e 06/1906
LNER (1924) 6097   27/12/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1492   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1482   12/01/1947
BR 61482   Not applied

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1906 IMMINGHAM

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B4/206/1906
B4/410/08/1940
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9458
Works Number 4818
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Fri 24/11/1950 off Ardsley (37A)
Scrapping During 01/1951 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 25/11/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1906
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 27/10/1922
MEX Mexborough m/e 01/1924
DON Doncaster 28/03/1924
ARD Ardsley 03/01/1925
DON Doncaster 23/09/1932
MEX Mexborough 25/01/1933
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 08/03/1933
LIN Lincoln 12/08/1939
ARD Ardsley 11/07/1947
   Withdrawn 24/11/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ARD Ardsley 11/07/1947
WDN   24/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1906 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1207)
27/04/1907 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1205)
21/08/1915 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1209)
03/07/1920 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1333)
27/12/1924 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 539)
22/05/1926 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 684)
14/03/1931 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 132)
24/09/1932 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 802)
09/12/1933 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 55)
24/08/1935 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 923)
10/08/1940 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 802)
17/10/1942 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 132)
11/11/1944 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 922)
29/03/1947 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 3265)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 06/04/1907 27/04/1907 22 days General
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1915 21/08/1915 50 days General
Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1920 03/07/1920 71 days General
Boiler number 1333 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1922 29/07/1922 85 days General  
Gorton Works 21/06/1924 27/12/1924 190 days General
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 16Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6097
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1925 13/06/1925 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 27/02/1926 22/05/1926 85 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1928 07/07/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 14/02/1931 14/03/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1932 24/09/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1933 09/12/1933 43 days General
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1935 24/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/05/1937 05/06/1937 22 days General  
Gorton Works 20/07/1940 10/08/1940 22 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/4
Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1941 10/05/1941 22 days Heavy
New cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1942 17/10/1942 18 days General
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1944 11/11/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1947 29/03/1947 36 days General
Painted green
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 16Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1097, name: IMMINGHAM
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4818
Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted
   
06/04/1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1907. Dep: 27/04/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
03/07/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1915. Dep: 21/08/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
24/04/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1333 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
06/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1922. Dep: 29/07/1922.    
27/10/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
28/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
21/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1924. Dep: 27/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 16Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6097
   
03/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
06/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/06/1925. Dep: 13/06/1925.    
27/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1926. Dep: 22/05/1926.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
12/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1928. Dep: 07/07/1928.    
14/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1931. Dep: 14/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
27/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
23/09/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/01/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
08/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
28/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
10/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1935. Dep: 24/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
15/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1937. Dep: 05/06/1937.    
12/08/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
20/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 10/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/4
Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
19/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 10/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders fitted
   
30/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
28/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1492 but not taken up    
12/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 1482    
22/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Painted green
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
11/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61482 but not taken up    
24/11/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 1482 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev