Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 110 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7564 Week
» 10146 Month
» 274779 Year
» 1496344 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1098 m/e 06/1906
LNER (1924) 6098   03/01/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1493   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1483   12/01/1947
BR 61483   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B4/206/1906
B4/318/08/1934
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9458
Works Number 4819
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Mon 26/09/1949 off Ardsley (ARD)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 43 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1906
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 06/10/1922
MEX Mexborough m/e 01/1924
DON Doncaster on 02/06/1924
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) on 10/01/1925
ARD Ardsley on 25/01/1940
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) on 03/11/1946
ARD Ardsley on 16/02/1947
   Withdrawn on 26/09/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COP Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 09/11/1946
ALLOC ARD Ardsley on 16/02/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1906 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1208)
29/10/1910 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1210)
23/12/1916 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1214)
10/06/1922 Ross Pop
03/01/1925 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1333)
06/10/1928 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 922)
09/07/1932 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 801)
19/12/1936 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 132)
29/01/1938 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 55)
20/09/1941 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 922)
09/10/1943 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 128)
29/09/1945 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 127)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/07/1910 29/10/1910 114 days General
Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1916 23/12/1916 148 days General
Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1922 10/06/1922 148 days General
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1924 03/01/1925 127 days General
Boiler number 1333 (Diagram 16Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6098
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1925 05/09/1925 57 days General  
Gorton Works 20/11/1926 05/02/1927 78 days General  
Gorton Works 18/08/1928 06/10/1928 50 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1930 15/11/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 18/06/1932 09/07/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1934 18/08/1934 43 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/3
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1936 19/12/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1938 29/01/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1941 20/09/1941 31 days General
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1943 09/10/1943 19 days General
Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1944 07/10/1944 11 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 19/05/1945 26/05/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 25/08/1945 29/09/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1945 19/01/1946 29 days Light Repair
After derailment
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1949 26/09/1949 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1098
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4819
Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted
   
08/07/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1910. Dep: 29/10/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
29/07/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1916. Dep: 23/12/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
14/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1922. Dep: 10/06/1922.
Work undertaken:
Ross Pop
   
06/10/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
30/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1924. Dep: 03/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1333 (Diagram 16Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6098
   
10/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
11/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1925. Dep: 05/09/1925.    
20/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1926. Dep: 05/02/1927.    
18/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1928. Dep: 06/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
11/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1930. Dep: 15/11/1930.    
18/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
07/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/3
   
28/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
08/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
25/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
21/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
21/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
27/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944.    
19/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945.    
25/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
22/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
After derailment
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1493 but not taken up    
03/11/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
12/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 1483    
16/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61483 but not taken up    
26/09/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1483 from Ardsley (ARD)    
26/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/09/1949. Dep: 26/09/1949.    

prev prev