Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1099 m/e 06/1906
LNER (1924) 6099   26/04/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1494   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1484   31/08/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B4/206/1906
B4/427/04/1940
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9458
Works Number 4820
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Thu 20/11/1947 off Ardsley (ARD)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 41 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 30/09/1921
SHF Sheffield Neepsend m/e 01/1925
NWE New England 30/05/1925
ARD Ardsley 02/01/1926
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) m/e 01/1935
GOR Gorton 25/01/1940
ARD Ardsley 27/04/1940
DON Doncaster 21/11/1942
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 25/06/1945
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 02/12/1945
ARD Ardsley 19/05/1946
   Withdrawn 20/11/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BFD Bradford Hammerton Street m/e 31/01/1946
WDN ARD Ardsley 20/11/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1906 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1209)
26/11/1910 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1208)
14/06/1913 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 834)
31/10/1914 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1211)
30/04/1921 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1149)
26/04/1924 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1210)
11/12/1926 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 784)
02/05/1931 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 684)
08/04/1933 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 923)
11/05/1935 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 797)
31/12/1936 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 801)
27/04/1940 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 122)
12/06/1943 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 801)
09/12/1944 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 684)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/10/1910 26/11/1910 44 days General
Boiler number 1208 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1913 14/06/1913 43 days General
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/09/1914 31/10/1914 50 days General
Boiler number 1211 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1921 30/04/1921 78 days General
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1922 14/10/1922 64 days General  
Gorton Works 01/03/1924 26/04/1924 57 days General
Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 16Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6099
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1926 11/12/1926 183 days General
Superheated boiler & new slide valve cylinders fitted
Boiler number 784 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1929 15/06/1929 50 days General  
Gorton Works 12/04/1930 19/04/1930 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 28/03/1931 02/05/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1933 08/04/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1935 11/05/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1936 31/12/1936 20 days General
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1940 27/04/1940 29 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/4
Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1941 08/02/1941 15 days Light Repair
New right hand cylinder
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1943 12/06/1943 12 days General
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1944 09/12/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1946 31/08/1946 1 day Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1484
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as GCR Number 1099
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4820
Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted
   
14/10/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1910. Dep: 26/11/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1208 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
03/05/1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1913. Dep: 14/06/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
12/09/1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1914. Dep: 31/10/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1211 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
12/02/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1921. Dep: 30/04/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
30/09/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1922. Dep: 14/10/1922.    
01/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 26/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 16Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6099
   
01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
30/05/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
02/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
12/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1926. Dep: 11/12/1926.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler & new slide valve cylinders fitted
Boiler number 784 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
27/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 15/06/1929.    
12/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 19/04/1930.    
28/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
25/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
01/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
27/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1935. Dep: 11/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
12/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
25/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/4
Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
27/04/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
25/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
New right hand cylinder
   
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
01/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
11/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
02/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1494 but not taken up    
19/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
31/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1484
   
20/11/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1484 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev